Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-42180

Washington Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary Jo Heston
Case #: 3:24-ap-04025
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Modern Homestead LLC, a Texas limited liability company
Represented By
Modern Homestead LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rick Town, an individual
Represented By
Rick Town
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Town, an individual
Represented By
Ryan Town
contact info
Plaintiff
Harbor Custom Development Inc
Represented By
Aditi Paranjpye
Cairncross & Hemplemann, P.S.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:07 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
order Close Adversary Wed 10/23 4:00 PM
CLOSED. Adversary Case 3:24-ap-4025 Closed . (MEH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss Adversary Case Thu 10/03 1:23 PM
Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Adversary Case Filed by Deborah A Crabbe on behalf of Modern Homestead LLC (Crabbe, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
17 17 misc Mediation Certification (ADR) Tue 05/14 11:06 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
16 16 misc Mediation Certification (ADR) Mon 05/13 5:19 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/07 12:56 PM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by Michael Curtis Roberts of Jackson Walker L.L.P. on behalf of Modern Homestead LLC, Rick Town, Ryan Town. (Roberts, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 05/06 4:06 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Related [+]. Filed by Alan Schuchman of Cairncross & Hempelmann, P.S. on behalf of Harbor Custom Development Inc. (Schuchman, Alan)
Related: [-] 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
13 13 order Pro Hac Vice Order Wed 05/01 11:50 AM
ORDER on Pro Hac Vice Application (Michael C Roberts for Modern Homestead LLC, Rick Town and Ryan Town). Related [+] . (MEH)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
12 12 misc Received UNSIGNED Order Tue 04/30 5:31 PM
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Application (fee) Tue 04/30 5:24 PM
Pro Hac Vice Application Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Statement of Local Counsel .. Filed by Deborah A Crabbe on behalf of Modern Homestead LLC, Rick Town, Ryan Town (Crabbe, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 04/30 5:25 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion Pro Hac Vice Application( 24-04025 MJH) [motion,1990] ( 249.00). Receipt number A28310840. Fee amount $ 249.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
10 10 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Mon 04/15 4:17 PM
Answer to Complaint and , Counterclaim by Modern Homestead LLC, Rick Town, Ryan Town against Harbor Custom Development Inc .. Filed by Deborah A Crabbe of Foster Garvey PC on behalf of Modern Homestead LLC, Rick Town, Ryan Town. (Crabbe, Deborah)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 4:07 PM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by Deborah A Crabbe of Foster Garvey PC on behalf of Modern Homestead LLC, Rick Town, Ryan Town. (Crabbe, Deborah)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 3:52 PM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by Beau Butler of Jackson Walker LLP on behalf of Modern Homestead LLC, Rick Town, Ryan Town. (Butler, Beau)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by Jennifer F. Wertz of Jackson Walker LLP on behalf of Modern Homestead LLC, Rick Town, Ryan Town. (Wertz, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
6 6 misc Proof of Service Fri 03/15 3:21 PM
Proof of Service . Filed by Aditi Paranjpye on behalf of Harbor Custom Development Inc. Related [+]. (Paranjpye, Aditi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons and Pretrial Conference
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/15 10:24 AM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by Alan Schuchman of Cairncross & Hempelmann, P.S. on behalf of Harbor Custom Development Inc. (Schuchman, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
4 4 court Summons and Pretrial Conference Thu 03/14 2:13 PM
Summons issued to Plaintiff's Attorney, Aditi Paranjpye, for Service on Modern Homestead LLC Answer Due 4/15/2024; Rick Town Answer Due 4/15/2024; Ryan Town Answer Due 4/15/2024 . (AMT)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 03/14 1:56 PM
Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing . Filed by Eve H Karasik on behalf of Courtesy NEF. (Karasik, Eve)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 03/14 1:52 PM
Request for Courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing . Filed by John-Patrick M. Fritz on behalf of Courtesy NEF. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 03/13 5:25 PM
Adversary case[LINK 24-04025 . Adversary case 24-04025 Complaint by HARBOR CUSTOM DEVELOPMENT, INC. (attorneys Alan Schuchman, Aditi Paranjpye) against MODERN HOMESTEAD, LLC, RICK TOWN, RYAN TOWN. . Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Paranjpye, Aditi)
Related: [-]