Montoya v. Kohala Zipline LLC
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00121 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 14, 2024 11:12 AM HST |
Defendant
Kohala Zipline LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Maria Montoya
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
2 - Set Hearings
Thu 04/25 11:10 AM
EO: In light of Defendant's appearance in this case, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2024 is ADVANCED to 6/10/2024 at 9:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Case Reassignment
Wed 04/24 7:59 AM
NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 24-00121 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Consent Election Form
Wed 04/24 7:25 AM
|
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 3:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kohala Zipline LLC. (Inouye, Ryan) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/23 3:12 PM
Defendant Kohala Zipline LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service by Kohala Zipline LLC.(Inouye, Ryan) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings 2 - Set Hearings
Mon 04/15 9:35 AM
EO: In order to allow time for service of the Complaint, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 5/13/2024 to 7/15/2024 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (wrp1) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent Election Form
Tue 04/09 12:15 PM
|
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/14 12:39 PM
NOTICE by Maria Montoya of Interested Parties Maria Montoya. (Easley, Preston) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/14 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. PLEASE COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM (FILING INSTRUCTIONS ARE ATTACHED). While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
Att: 1 Election Form | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/14 10:39 AM
Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Thu 03/14 10:37 AM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Thu 03/14 10:35 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/13/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/14/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/14 10:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Kohala Zipline LLC. (eta) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/14 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00121 WRP on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons (Proposed)
Thu 03/14 10:17 AM
Summons (Proposed) (Easley, Preston) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/14 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2974411.), filed by Maria Montoya.(Easley, Preston) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |