Minnesota District Court
Judge:Laura M Provinzino
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:24-cv-00944
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 3:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Edward Arneson
Represented By
Andrew A. Wolf
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Paul D Reuvers
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Defendant
Joe Grund
Represented By
Andrew A. Wolf
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Paul D Reuvers
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Defendant
Cody Hasbargen
Represented By
Andrew A. Wolf
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Paul D Reuvers
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Defendant
Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners
Represented By
Andrew A. Wolf
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Paul D Reuvers
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Defendant
Lake of the Woods County
Represented By
Andrew A. Wolf
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Paul D Reuvers
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Defendant
James Nordlof
Represented By
Andrew A. Wolf
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Paul D Reuvers
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Defendant
Jon Waibel
Represented By
Andrew A. Wolf
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Paul D Reuvers
Iverson Reuvers
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Audette
Represented By
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Audette
Represented By
Gregory M Erickson
Mohrman Kaardal & Erickson, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
36 36 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 03/18 10:21 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER - In response to the parties letter (Docket No.30 ), the Court will hold a telephone status conference on Thursday, March 20, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. with lead counsel for both parties on the line. Lead counsel for the Plaintiffs shall coordinate the call, and dial chambers at (218) 529-3520 with lead counsel for the Defendants on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/18/2025.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
35 35 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Mon 03/17 10:40 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re31 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Becker, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 03/17 10:39 PM
Declaration of Maxwell D. Becker in Support of31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jennifer Audette, Robert Audette.(Becker, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) 17
33 33 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/17 10:34 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jennifer Audette, Robert Audette.(Becker, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 03/17 10:33 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION31 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Date and time to be determined. (Becker, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Summary Judgment Mon 03/17 10:31 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jennifer Audette, Robert Audette. (Becker, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Letter to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/17 4:24 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel JOINT REQUEST BY ALL PARTIES . (Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Mon 03/17 4:22 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel.(Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 03/17 4:21 PM
Declaration of Josh Stromlund in Support of23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel.(Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit(s) 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit(s) 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit(s) 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit(s) 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit(s) 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit(s) 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit(s) 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit(s) 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit(s) 29,
Att: 30 Exhibit(s) 30,
Att: 31 Exhibit(s) 31,
Att: 32 Exhibit(s) 32,
Att: 33 Exhibit(s) 33,
Att: 34 Exhibit(s) 34,
Att: 35 Exhibit(s) 35
27 27 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Mon 03/17 3:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Andrew A. Wolf in SUPPORT OF23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel.(Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 8
26 26 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/17 2:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel.(Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
25 25 misc Meet and Confer Statement Mon 03/17 2:54 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel.(Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 03/17 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION23 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Date and time to be determined. (Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Mon 03/17 2:50 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel. (Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 01/21 12:13 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/21/2025. (JLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
21 21 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Fri 01/17 1:35 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Motion20 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 01/17 1:34 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Jennifer Audette, Robert Audette. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/16 1:42 PM
AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 1/17/2025. Expert Discovery due by 1/17/2025. Motions (non-disp) due 2/17/2025. Motions (disp) due by 3/17/2025. Ready for trial due by 7/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/16/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
18 18 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Fri 12/13 10:58 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re16 Stipulation. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Non-Compliance Fri 12/13 7:20 AM
(Text-Only) NOTICE of Non-Compliance to attorney Gregory M Erickson. re:16 Stipulation Proposed Order not emailed to chambers in word processing format. Proposed Order not filed on CM/ECF. Please contact the appropriate chambers if further direction is needed. (JLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Thu 12/12 6:11 PM
STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order by Jennifer Audette, Robert Audette. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/05 11:02 AM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 4/3/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 (FF) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/5/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
14 14 notice Notice to Attorney - LMP Case Reassigned Tue 10/29 2:14 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Laura M. Provinzino, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Nancy E. Brasel is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-944 LMP/LIB . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Note: any current hearings or conferences before the district judge in this case are canceled unless otherwise indicated by the new DJ courtroom deputy. (kt)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
13 13 order Protective Order Mon 09/30 12:48 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/30/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
12 12 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 09/26 12:49 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re11 Stipulation,. (Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 09/26 12:49 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel. Jointly Signed by Jennifer Audette and Robert Audette. (Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/31 1:30 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2024. Fact Discovery due by 12/15/2024. Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2024. Motions (non-disp) due 1/15/2025. Motions (disp) due by 2/15/2025. Ready for trial due by 6/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 5/31/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
9 9 misc Statement of Case (cv) Fri 05/17 7:26 PM
STATEMENT OF CASE as to Robert Audette, Jennifer Audette. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 05/17 5:45 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel. Jointly Signed by Jennifer Audette and Robert Audette.(Wolf, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
7 7 misc Statement of Case (cv) Thu 05/16 2:36 PM
STATEMENT OF CASE as to Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods County, Joe Grund, Edward Arneson, Jon Waibel, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, James Nordlof. Related [+]
Related: [-] uvers, Paul
Monday, April 22, 2024
6 6 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/22 2:19 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/22/2024.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 The Case for Aggressive Civility,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/10 12:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel. Related [+]
Related: [-] uvers, Paul
Monday, March 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/25 11:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Audette, Jennifer Audette. Edward Arneson served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024; Joe Grund served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024; Cody Hasbargen served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024; Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024; Lake of the Woods County served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024; James Nordlof served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024; Jon Waibel served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/18 8:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Edward Arneson, Joe Grund, Cody Hasbargen, Lake of the Woods Board of Commissioners, Lake of the Woods County, James Nordlof, Jon Waibel. (BTX)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 03/18 8:38 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (6th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 24-cv-944 (NEB/LIB). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 6:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10907759) filed by Robert Audette, Jennifer Audette. Filer requests summons issued. (Erickson, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet