Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:24-cv-00303
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 3:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Dan Clozza
Defendant
Forum National Investments Ltd.
Defendant
Martin Tutschek
Plaintiff
Jay Howser
Represented By
Robert L. DeLaney
Tune, Entrekin & White, P.C.
contact info
Albert S. Watkins
Watkins, LLC
contact info
Michael D. Schwade
Kodner Watkins
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 10/15 3:12 PM
ORDER: The Plaintiff's Second Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference (Doc. No.15 ) is GRANTED. The plaintiff may have an additional 90 days, up to and including January 15, 2025, within which to secure service upon the defendants. When service has been obtained, the plaintiff should file a motion to reset the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/15/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
15 15 motion Continue Mon 10/14 1:41 PM
Second MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Jay Howser. (DeLaney, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 07/02 12:33 PM
ORDER: The Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference (Doc. No.13 ) is GRANTED, and the plaintiff is given an extension until October 15, 2024 within which to secure service upon the defendants. The initial case management conference is hereby RESET for November 18, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 07/02/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
13 13 motion Continue Mon 07/01 2:38 PM
MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Jay Howser. (DeLaney, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 06/25 3:26 PM
ORDER: The initial case management conference in this case is scheduled for Monday, July 15, 2024 at 3:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/25/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (jm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
11 11 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/12 4:54 PM
ORDER granting7 and8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Albert S. Watkins andMichael D. Schwade to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/12/2024. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 04/04 8:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Michael Schwade from the United States District Court for the Eastern of Missouri filed by Jay Howser. (DeLaney, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Good Standing Thu 04/04 8:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Albert S. Watkins from the United States District Court for the Eastern of Missouri filed by Jay Howser. (DeLaney, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 04/02 8:24 AM
MO State Bar status verified as active for Albert S. Watkins, Michael D. Schwade not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Tue 04/02 8:29 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 8 : The PHV motion must be accompanied by a Certificate of Good Standing dated within 6 months of filing from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/15 10:23 AM
MOTION for attorney Michael D. Schwade to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid) by Jay Howser.(af)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Attachment - Receipt
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/15 10:22 AM
MOTION for attorney Albert S. Watkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid) by Jay Howser.(af)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Attachment - Receipt
Thursday, March 14, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 03/14 3:36 PM
Summons issued as to Dan Clozza, Forum National Investments Ltd., Martin Tutschek. Service packet placed at intake window for counsel to pick up. (kc) Modified on 3/14/2024 (kc)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Thu 03/14 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 7/15/2024 at 03:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 03/14 3:17 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Thu 03/14 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Thu 03/14 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/14 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Forum National Investments Ltd., Dan Clozza, Martin Tutschek (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4034146), filed by Jay Howser.(kc) Modified on 3/14/2024 (kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Forum Secured Convertible Debenture Subscription Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Agreement to Amend Secured Convertible Debenture,
Att: 3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 03/14 3:19 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert L. DeLaney admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]