Miles et al v. City of St. George
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | David Nuffer |
Referred: | Paul Kohler |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00034 |
Nature of Suit | 210 Real Property - Land Condemnation |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 3:00 AM MDT |
Counter Claimant
City of St. George
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
John Miles
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Sarah Wei Wu
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of St. George
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Miles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Wei Wu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 04/08 5:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by City of St. George. Attorney J. Craig Smith added to party City of St. George(pty:dft)(Smith, J.) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Return of Service
Mon 03/25 8:55 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE Executed for Government Agency served on Annette Hansen on 03/18/2024, filed by Plaintiffs John Miles, Sarah Wei Wu. (Gardner, David) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/18 3:04 PM
ORDER supplementing 8 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 3/18/24 (alt) |
|
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order to Propose Schedule
Mon 03/18 3:02 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 3/18/24 (alt) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Fri 03/15 8:12 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to City of St. George. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec) |
|
notice
Notice From the Court
Fri 03/15 9:46 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT This case is assigned to the Southern Region of the Central Division of the District of Utah. More information is on the court's[LINK:Southern Region web page.] (pjd) |
||
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/15 10:13 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/15/2024. (pjd) |
||
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Thu 03/14 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs John Miles, Sarah Wei Wu. (Notice generated by Clerk's office) Form due by 4/4/2024. (kec) |
|
3 | 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re1 Complaint. Attorney selected the incorrect division when creating the case. Case 2:24-cv-00191 will be closed and all pleadings will be transferred to case 4:24-cv-00034. Case number will now read 4:24-cv-00034. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) | |
2 | 2
service
Request Summons
Thu 03/14 4:07 PM
Requested Summons as to City of St. George. (Gardner, David) Modified by replacing from plaintiffs to the defendant on the summons on 3/14/2024 (kec) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Thu 03/14 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT against City of St. George (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5000238) filed by John Miles, Sarah Wei Wu. (Gardner, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/14 4:19 PM
Judge David Nuffer added. Case number will now read 4:24-cv-00034-DN. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |
||
notice
Notice From the Court
Thu 03/14 4:16 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT re1 Complaint. Attorney selected the incorrect division when creating the case. Case 2:24-cv-00191 will be closed and all pleadings will be transferred to case 4:24-cv-00034. Case number will now read 4:24-cv-00034. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |