Ito v. Hawaii Health Systems Corporation et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Rom Trader |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00122 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 42:12101 Violation of Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 10:53 PM HST |
Defendant
Doe Corporations 1-10
1188 Bishop St Ste 2504
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
|
Defendant
Doe Entities 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Governmental Units 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Dawn Hao-Demotta
|
|
Defendant
Jane Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Kris Wilson
|
|
Defendant
Doe Partnerships 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Jason T. Ito
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Hilo Medical Center, State of Hawaii
Terminated: 04/18/2024
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/24 1:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Kris Wilson. (eta) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons (Proposed)
Mon 04/22 7:52 PM
Summons (Proposed) (Kawata, Mark) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 7:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Dawn Hao-Demotta. (eta) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/19 7:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Hawaii Health Systems Corporation. (eta) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 04/18 5:53 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dawn Hao-Demotta, Hilo Medical Center, State of Hawaii, Kris Wilson, filed by Jason T. Ito.(Kawata, Mark) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/14 2:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Dawn Hao-Demotta. (cgc) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/14 2:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Kris Wilson. (cgc) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/14 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Hilo Medical Center, State of Hawaii. (cgc) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Thu 03/14 2:29 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet.(cgc) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/14 2:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (cgc) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Thu 03/14 2:19 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/13/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/14/2024. (cgc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Thu 03/14 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00122 LEK-RT on all further pleadings . (cgc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/14 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2974662), filed by Jason Ito.(Kawata, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |