California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:24-cv-00553
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Terminated:Jun 04, 2024
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02023-01365892
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 10, 2024 1:25 AM PDT
Defendant
FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Represented By
Shaun J Voigt
Fisher And Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Dominique Zavala
Represented By
Stephen D Counts
Smaili And Associates PC
contact info
Jihad M Smaili
Smaili And Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
18 18 misc Receipt Tue 06/18 3:01 PM
Receipt of remand letter (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
17 17 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Wed 06/05 8:37 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court, West Justice Center. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court, West Justice Center. (twdb)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Remand Case to State Court Wed 06/05 8:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT SUA SPONTE by Judge David O. Carter. For the reasons set forth above, the Court hereby REMANDS this case to the Superior Court of Orange, California. The Status Conference set for June 10, 2024 is hereby VACATED and removed from the Courts calendar. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. Case number 30-2023 01365892-CU-WT-WJC. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 06/03 12:12 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Status Conference is set for 6/10/2024 08:30 AM in-person before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 06/03 9:03 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
13 13 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Fri 05/31 4:59 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-071) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS ORDERED, with the concurrence of the Case Management and Assignment Committee. This case is transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:24-cv-00553-DOC (DFMx). (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Thu 05/16 10:55 AM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 05/16 10:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 2/20/2025. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 4/21/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/6/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2025 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 7/1/2025 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
10 10 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 05/09 12:24 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 court days, filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc... (Lee, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/18 2:47 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on May 16, 2024. (rrp)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/18 11:32 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/18 11:31 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/18 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Thu 03/14 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Related Case(s): None (Voigt, Shaun)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/14 6:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Dominique Zavala; Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.; Fisher & Phillips LLP, counsel for Defendant; and Smaili & Associates, PC, counsel for Plaintiff. (Voigt, Shaun)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/14 6:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. identifying FedEx Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Voigt, Shaun)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/14 5:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Voigt, Shaun)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/14 5:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023 01365892 Receipt No: ACACDC-37098960 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attorney Shaun J Voigt added to party FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.(pty:dft))(Voigt, Shaun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew Endlish in Support of Defendant's Petition for Removal,
Att: 2 State Court Complaint
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 03/18 12:04 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does1-50, inclusive, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Dominique Zavala. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/7/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 03/18 12:06 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/14/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 3)(ghap)
Related: [-]