MODM Kolay Manufacturing LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Deborah J Saltzman |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-11987 |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
MODM Kolay Manufacturing LLC
6075 E Ann Rd
Las Vegas, NV 89115-1986 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Fri 04/26 9:40 PM
Hearing Held . COURT RULING: Status conference vacated. Case dismissed per order entered on 4/16/24. (MB2) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Thu 04/18 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 04/18 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 53. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Thu 04/18 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 53. Notice Date 04/18/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Notice of dismissal w/restriction for refiling (BNC)
Tue 04/16 1:47 PM
Notice of dismissal with restriction for against debtor's refiling (BNC) (MB2) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Notice of dismissal w/restriction for refiling (BNC)
Tue 04/16 1:41 PM
Notice of dismissal with restriction for against debtor's refiling (BNC) (MB2) |
|
31 | 31
order
Dismissing Case (BNC-PDF)
Tue 04/16 1:40 PM
Order granting motion to dismiss chapter 11 bankruptcy case pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b)(1). This case is dismissed with a180-day bar to refiling. Debtor Dismissed (BNC-PDF). Signed on 4/16/2024 |
|
30 | 30
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Tue 04/16 9:15 AM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Debtor MODM Kolay Manufacturing LLC . (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
court
Hearing Held (Motion)
Fri 04/12 12:32 AM
Hearing Held . COURT RULING: GRANT MOTIONS TO DISMISS (BOTH CASES) WITH 180 DAY BAR. (MB2) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Reply
Tue 04/09 7:31 PM
Reply to Response Of Diamond Creek Capital LLC To Opposition To Debtors Motion To Dismiss Chapter 11 Case (With Proof of Service) Filed by Creditor Diamond Creek Capital, LLC (Sahn, Victor) |
|
27 | 27
answer
Reply
Tue 04/09 4:49 PM
Reply to Omnibus Reply to Oppositions to Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b)(1); Declarations of Daniel Mitchell, Andrew G. Prout and Gerald M. Fisher in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor MODM Kolay Manufacturing LLC (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
26 | 26
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Tue 04/09 1:59 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Harris, Douglas. (Harris, Douglas) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
answer
Opposition
Mon 04/08 5:59 PM
Opposition to 880 Apartments, L.L.C.'s Opposition to Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Interested Party 880 Apartments, L.L.C. (Lerner, Leib) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Opposition
Thu 04/04 2:23 PM
Opposition to Filed by Creditor Tri-West, Ltd. (Friedman, Roger) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Objection
Thu 04/04 1:46 PM
Objection U.S. Trustee's Limited Objection to Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Casetion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) (Madoyan, Noreen) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Tue 04/02 4:26 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Terry, Brian. (Terry, Brian) |
|
Saturday, March 30, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sat 03/30 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK Case)
Thu 03/28 4:19 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing and Declaration of Telephonic Notice re Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case to 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b)(1) with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor MODM Kolay Manufacturing LLC . (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
19 | 19
court
Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Thu 03/28 10:29 AM
Hearing Set . The Hearing date is set for 4/11/2024 at 11:30 AM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman. Due to the COVID-19 public health emergency, the courtroom will be closed to the public and the hearing will be held via ZoomGov, which provides both audio and video access. All parties and members of the public may connect to the hearing free of charge. ZoomGov connection information for this hearing will be posted on the Court's public calendar for Judge Saltzman, accessible on the court's website: http://ecf-ciao.cacb.uscourts.gov/CiaoPosted/default.aspx. (MB2) |
|
18 | 18
order
Shortening time (BNC-PDF)
Thu 03/28 10:26 AM
Order Granting ORDER shortening time on Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b)(1). HEARING SET ON 4/11/2024 AT 11:30 A.M. Via ZoomGov. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/28/2024 (MB2) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/27 5:14 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Daniel Mitchell in Support of Application for Order Setting Hearing on Shortened Notice Re Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b)(1) Filed by Debtor MODM Kolay Manufacturing LLC . (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Shortening time (motion)
Wed 03/27 5:12 PM
Application shortening time Application for Order Setting Hearing on Shortened Notice Filed by Debtor MODM Kolay Manufacturing LLC (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
15 | 15
motion
X - Motion (Generic) (motion)
Wed 03/27 5:09 PM
Motion Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b)(1); Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Daniel Mitchell in Support Thereof Filed by Debtor MODM Kolay Manufacturing LLC (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Tue 03/19 5:43 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Coleman, Claudia. (Coleman, Claudia) |
|
Sunday, March 17, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Sun 03/17 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sun 03/17 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sun 03/17 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Sun 03/17 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 47. Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice
Fri 03/15 4:25 PM
Notice of Non-Consent to the Use of Cash Collateral and Demand for Sequestration of Cash Collateral and Related Collateral by Secured Creditor Diamond Creek Capital, LLC (with Proof of Service) Filed by Creditor Diamond Creek Capital, LLC. (Sahn, Victor) |
|
8 | 8
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Fri 03/15 2:31 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Bello, Reem. (Bello, Reem) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Fri 03/15 2:03 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/16/2024 at 10:30 AM at UST-LA3, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-811-2961, PARTICIPANT CODE:9609127. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 6/17/2024. (LL2) |
|
6 | 6
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Fri 03/15 1:37 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Sahn, Victor. (Sahn, Victor) |
|
5 | 5
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Fri 03/15 1:29 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Horoupian, Mark. (Horoupian, Mark) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option)
Fri 03/15 1:19 PM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 4/25/2024 at 11:30 AM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman. Due to the COVID-19 public health emergency, the courtroom will be closed to the public and the hearing will be held via ZoomGov, which provides both audio and video access. All parties and members of the public may connect to the hearing free of charge. ZoomGov connection information for this hearing will be posted on the Court's public calendar for Judge Saltzman, accessible on the court's website: http://ecf-ciao.cacb.uscourts.gov/CiaoPosted/default.aspx. (MB2) |
|
3 | 3
order
X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF)
Fri 03/15 1:10 PM
Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference. Status conference set on April 25, 2024 at 11:30 a.m., in Courtroom 1639 (via ZoomGov). (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/15/2024 (MB2) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
nef
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Thu 03/14 9:20 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Broker, Jeffrey. (Broker, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 03/14 8:18 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by MODM Kolay Manufacturing LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 03/28/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 03/28/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 03/28/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 03/28/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 03/28/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 03/28/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 03/28/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 03/28/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 03/28/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 03/28/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 03/28/2024. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 03/28/2024. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 03/28/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 03/28/2024. (Forsythe, Marc) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 03/14 8:23 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:24-bk-11987] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56613288. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |