New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00145
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Yasser Cruz (1)
Represented By
Michael Arthus
Federal Defenders Of New York
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph Rosenberg
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/15/2024 4:10 AM EDT
Thursday, February 15, 2024
Arrest of Yasser Cruz. (job) [1:24-mj-00707-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Yasser Cruz. Attorney Michael Arthus for Yasser Cruz added. (job) [1:24-mj-00707-UA]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Yasser Cruz (1). Violation of 18 U.S.C. §§ 922(g)(1) & 2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo) (job) [1:24-mj-00707-UA]
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yasser Cruz. Federal Defender, attorney Michael Arthus appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo) (job) [1:24-mj-00707-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo: Initial Appearance as to Yasser Cruz held on 2/16/2024. Bond Hearing as to Yasser Cruz held on 2/16/2024. AUSA Joseph Rosenberg present for the Government. Deft. present with attorney Michael Arthus. BAIL DISPOSITION: $50,000.00 PRB; CO-SIGNED BY 2 FRP'S; TRAVEL LIMITS INCLUDE THE SDNY/EDNY/DCT AND POINTS BETWEEN FOR COURT TRAVEL; SURRENDER OF TRAVEL DOCUMENTS AND NO NEW APPLICATIONS; PRETRIAL SUPERVISION AS DIRECTED BY PRETRIAL SERVICES; HOME DETENTION INCLUDING LOCATION MONITORING AS DIRECTED BY PTS; DEFENDANT TO CONTINUE OR SEEK EMPLOYMENT; DEFT NOT TO POSSESS FIREARMS/DESTRUCTIVE DEVICES/OTHER WEAPONS; DEFT TO BE RELEASED ON OWN SIGNATURE; ALL REMAINING CONDITIONS TO BE MET BY 3/1/24. ***Preliminary Hearing Date: 3/19/2024 On Defendant's Consent. (job) [1:24-mj-00707-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Yasser Cruz. $50,000 personal recognizance bond; To be co-signed by two financially responsible persons. Additional conditions... (job) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/4/2024) (job). [1:24-mj-00707-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
Case Designated ECF as to Yasser Cruz. (jm)
Related: [-]
5 5 INDICTMENT FILED as to Yasser Cruz (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Yasser Cruz: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an arraignment and initial conference will be held on Thursday, March 28, 2024, at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, located at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Arraignment/Initial Conference set for 3/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/14/2024) (lnl)
Related: [-]
7 7 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from USA dated March 14, 2024 re: Request for Exclusion of Time (on Consent) . Document filed by USA as to Yasser Cruz. (Rosenberg, Joseph)
Related: [-]