Another Level Realty LLC v. Navient Solutions, LLC
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Indira Talwani |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10637 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 9:31 PM EDT |
Defendant
Navient Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Another Level Realty LLC
34 Bradlee Street
Boston, MA 02124 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/28 4:24 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff Another Level Realty LLC?s Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint8 . Plaintiff Another Level Realty LLC submitted this motion without an attorney appearing on its behalf. Under Local Rule 83.5.5(c), ?[a] corporation, partnership, limited liability company, trust, estate, or other entity that is not an individual may not appear pro se , and no individual who is not an attorney authorized to practice in this court may appear on behalf of the entity.? The Local Rule provides further that ?[t]he court may strike any pleading filed on behalf of any entity that purports to appear pro se.? Id. Accordingly, if Plaintiff seeks to pursue this litigation, it must do so through counsel. In order to allow Plaintiff an opportunity to obtain counsel, Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 6 is extended to April 30, 2024. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 03/26 11:04 AM
MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Another Level Realty LLC.(Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 03/22 11:32 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Navient Solutions, LLC. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 03/22 11:24 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Navient Solutions, LLC.(Menge, Christa) Modified on 3/22/2024: Removed memorandum of law to properly file as separate entry. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Att: 7 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
Tue 03/19 12:45 PM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Navient Solutions, LLC. (Menge, Christa) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Fri 03/15 10:25 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Dore, Samantha) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/15 9:53 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 03/15 8:37 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 12:29 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Navient Solutions, LLC Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10318075 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Navient Solutions, LLC.(Menge, Christa) Modified on 3/15/2024: Updated docket text.(Dore, Samantha) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A- State Court Filings, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B- State Court Notice of Hearing, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Notice of Notice of Removal |