Original Case: 1:21-cv-05407

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01381
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 4:41 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS
Represented By
Jessica M. Scheller
OFFICE OF THE COOK COUNTY STATE'S ATTORNEY
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BARBARA LUKASZCZYK, also known as BASIA LUKASZCZYK
Represented By
Jonathan Lubin
LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN LUBIN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WENDY A. ROGOWSKI
Represented By
Jonathan Lubin
LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN LUBIN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TOMAS MACKEVICIUS
Represented By
Jonathan Lubin
LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN LUBIN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LYNETTE TAYLOR
Represented By
Jonathan Lubin
LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN LUBIN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARY E. KOSENKA
Represented By
Jonathan Lubin
LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN LUBIN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LATEHESHA FITCH
Represented By
Jonathan Lubin
LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN LUBIN
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/15/2024 4:40 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Latehesha Fitch, Mary E. Kosenka, Barbara Lukaszczyk, Tomas Mackevicius, Wendy A. Rogowski and Lynette Taylor by 03/18/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 03/26/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/22/2024 for Latehesha Fitch, Mary E. Kosenka, Barbara Lukaszczyk, Tomas Mackevicius, Wendy A. Rogowski and Lynette Taylor. [1] [7369741] 24-1381 (CG) [Entered: 03/13/2024 09:21 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 3 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court