Okosi v. Roby
Original Case: 1:21-cv-11884
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-01241 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
SCOTT ROBY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL OKOSI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/15/2024 5:38 AM EDT |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #153) filed by Appellant Scott Roby. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/28/2024. 24-1241 (JW) | ||
Att: 1 58 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |