Assaf v. Boys and Girls Club of Hawaii
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Derrick K Watson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00123 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 2:06 AM HST |
Defendant
Boys and Girls Club of Hawaii
1000 Bishop Street, Suite 505
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
|
Plaintiff
Nadia Assaf
c/o 1860 Hatteras Way
Sumter, SC 29153 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings 2 - Set Hearings
Fri 04/19 9:14 AM
EO: To allow Defendant time to respond to the Complaint, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 5/13/2024 to 7/29/2024 at 8:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (wrp1i) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/18 5:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nadia Assaf. All Defendants. (Howell, Perry) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Case Reassignment
Thu 04/11 7:05 AM
NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 24-00123 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/11 6:59 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ANDREW WYLAM, ESQ. re15 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/11/2024. (eta) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Consent Election Form
Wed 04/10 2:46 PM
|
|
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 11:55 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Andrew Wylam Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2986317.Perry Ann Howell appearing for Plaintiff Nadia Assaf (Howell, Perry) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent Election Form
Tue 04/09 10:18 AM
|
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/22 6:36 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO VICTORIA WILLIAMSON, ESQ. re11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 3/22/2024. (eta) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/21 6:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nadia Assaf re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Victoria Williamson] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2978351. (Howell, Perry) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/21 5:40 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Victoria Williamson] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2978351.Elbridge W. Smith appearing for Plaintiff Nadia Assaf(Smith, Elbridge) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Order | ||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/20 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Elliot Row on behalf of Boys and Girls Club of Hawaii on behalf of Boys and Girls Club of Hawaii.(Row, Isaac) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/20 4:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boys and Girls Club of Hawaii.(Gibo, Trisha) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/20 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha C. Gibo on behalf of Boys and Girls Club of Hawaii on behalf of Boys and Girls Club of Hawaii.(Gibo, Trisha) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/15 6:39 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. PLEASE COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM (FILING INSTRUCTIONS ARE ATTACHED) . While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory . Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
Att: 1 Election Form | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/15 6:36 AM
Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Fri 03/15 6:35 AM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Fri 03/15 6:33 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/13/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/15/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/15 6:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Boys and Girls Club of Hawaii. (eta) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/15 6:25 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00123 WRP on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
misc
Incorrect Attorney Filer
Fri 03/15 6:24 AM
ADVISORY ENTRY . Incorrect Attorney Filer - Please be advised that Document1 Complaint filed by Nadia Assaf, was signed by an attorney other than the one identified as the e-filer. The name of the CM/ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must correspond to the signature of the attorney signing the CM/ECF filed document. No further action is necessary. (eta) |
||
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/14 6:57 PM
COMPLAINT For Damages against Boys and Girls Club of Hawaii ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2975059.), filed by Nadia Assaf.(Smith, Elbridge) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |