Demosthene et al v. Rosina Food Products, Inc.
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | John L Sinatra, Jr |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00225 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Rosina Food Products, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jacky Demosthene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laquita Jones
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 04/22 2:08 PM
ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Text Order
Wed 04/17 2:59 PM
TEXT ORDER re7 unopposed request for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 5/31/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 4/17/2024. (NAK) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 04/16 4:04 PM
Letter filed by Rosina Food Products, Inc. . (Kwiatkowski, Arianna) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Arianna Elise Kwiatkowski on behalf of Rosina Food Products, Inc. (Kwiatkowski, Arianna) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/01 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacky Demosthene, Laquita Jones. Rosina Food Products, Inc. served on 3/26/2024, answer due 4/16/2024. (Nilges, Hans) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/19 3:36 PM
NOTICE by Jacky Demosthene, Laquita Jones of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)(Nilges, Hans) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form | ||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/18 3:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Rosina Food Products, Inc. (JHF) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 3:19 PM
Case assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to chambers of civil on-line case opening. (JHF) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/18 3:21 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JHF) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Mon 03/18 3:22 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] .' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (JHF) |
||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/15 10:26 AM
NOTICE by Jacky Demosthene, Laquita Jones of Filing Consent to Join Forms Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b)(Nilges, Hans) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms | ||
1 | 1
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 10:10 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rosina Food Products, Inc. $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5130511, filed by Jacky Demosthene, Laquita Jones.(Nilges, Hans) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |