Padilla v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Bridget Meehan Brennan |
Referred: | Jennifer Dowdell Armstron |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00484 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis
Mon 03/18 3:43 PM
Order [non-document]granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis . Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 3/18/2024.(K,L) |
||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Magistrate Judges Initial Order
Fri 03/15 2:40 PM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 3/15/2024. (K,L) |
|
4 | 4
order
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order
Fri 03/15 10:47 AM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/15/2024. (E,CK) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (atty event)
Fri 03/15 9:59 AM
Certification that Social Security Number Sent to Defendant filed by Erick L. Padilla. (Smith, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/15 9:54 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Erick L. Padilla. Related document(s)1 . (Smith, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 9:52 AM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Erick L. Padilla. (Smith, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Fri 03/15 10:13 AM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (E,CK) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/15 10:14 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (E,CK) |
||
oth_evt
Notice of Social Security Complaint
Fri 03/15 10:46 AM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (E,CK) |
||
order
Automatic Reference of Administrative Action
Fri 03/15 10:49 AM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. (E,CK) |