Hassan v. Director of U.S. Immigration Services, et al.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Ruiz |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00483 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
|
Defendant
Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
|
|
Plaintiff
Ali Maher Hassan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_doc
Supplement (atty event)
Tue 04/09 4:33 PM
Supplement to Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant, - Amended Return of Service by Certified Mail executed upon U.S. Attorney Rebecca C. Lutzko, filed by Ali Maher Hassan. Related document(s)3 . (Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service Executed - USA Defendant
Fri 03/29 11:07 AM
Return of Service by Certified Mail executed upon Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services on 3/26/2024; Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 3/26/2024 filed on behalf of Ali Maher Hassan (Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Fri 03/15 8:45 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Summons also issued for the US Attorney General and US Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio). (G,M) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 5:33 AM
Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Complaint for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12459043. Filed by Ali Maher Hassan. (Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Fri 03/15 8:39 AM
Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (G,M) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/15 8:40 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (G,M) |