Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:24-cv-00340
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Magic Leap, Inc.
Plaintiff
RecepTrexx LLC
Represented By
Antranig N. Garibian
Garibian Law Offices, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Monday, August 26, 2024
12 12 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Mon 08/26 9:51 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,012,652.(kmd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 08/26 9:50 AM
CASE CLOSED per11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/12 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RecepTrexx LLC as to MAGIC LEAP, INC. (Garibian, Antranig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 07/09 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Magic Leap, Inc. by RecepTrexx LLC (Garibian, Antranig)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 06/07 2:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - filed by RecepTrexx LLC. (Garibian, Antranig)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 06/07 2:41 PM
SO ORDERED, re9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by RecepTrexx LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Magic Leap, Inc. answer due 7/10/2024. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/7/2024. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Wed 06/05 9:31 AM
Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by RecepTrexx LLC. (Garibian, Antranig)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 day ddl Fri 04/12 4:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by RecepTrexx LLC: For Magic Leap, Inc. waiver sent on 4/11/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Garibian, Antranig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/20 3:03 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00339-CFC, 1:24-cv-00340-CFC(nmf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/20 12:25 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00339-CFC, 1:24-cv-00340-CFC (rjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 03/15 11:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Magic Leap, Inc. on 3/15/2024. (mpb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Fri 03/15 11:42 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by RecepTrexx LLC. (mpb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Fri 03/15 11:41 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,012,652. (mpb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 03/15 11:40 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/15 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Magic Leap, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4362645.) - filed by RecepTrexx LLC.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Appearance of Counsel,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet