St. John v. Campbell
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Indira Talwani |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10646 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/17 8:26 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 8 . Petitioner states that she is unable to pay the docket fees, see [8-1] at 5, but the filing fee has already been paid, see 1 . (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 8:53 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sandra Natasha St. John.(Ugolini, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/03 8:33 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER allowing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to May 20, 2024 to File Answer. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/01 3:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2024 to File Answer by Andrea Joy Campbell.(Johnston, Tara) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/01 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lyn Johnston on behalf of Andrea Joy Campbell (Johnston, Tara) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Copy Mailed
Fri 03/15 12:38 PM
Copy re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254),3 Service Order - 2254 Petition, mailed to Attorney General on 3/15/2024. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
3 | 3
order
Service Order-2254 Petition
Fri 03/15 12:30 PM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/15 12:25 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Fri 03/15 12:10 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number AMADC-10318931 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Sandra Natasha St. John.(Ugolini, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2024: Updated docket text. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet , | ||
Att: 2 Category Form, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Petitioner's exhibits 1-14, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Petitioner's exhibits 15-26 |