Weaver v. Progress Software Corporation et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Allison D Burroughs |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10645 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Michigan Eastern, 2:24-cv-10157 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 12:18 PM EDT |
Defendant
Beaumont Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progress Software Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Welltok, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 03/28 1:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Weaver. Beaumont Health waiver sent on 3/18/2024, answer due 5/17/2024. (Johnson, Kristen) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/22 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg on behalf of Jeffrey Weaver (Goldenberg, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/20 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Schaffer on behalf of Jeffrey Weaver (Schaffer, Charles) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/20 9:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Latiff on behalf of Beaumont Health (Latiff, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/20 8:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Lowe, I on behalf of Beaumont Health (Lowe, Timothy) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/18 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Matt on behalf of Jeffrey Weaver (Matt, Sean) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/18 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Anne Johnson on behalf of Jeffrey Weaver (Johnson, Kristen) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice re: MDL Case Transferred
Fri 03/15 12:02 PM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number 28 entered in MDL No. 3083, Eastern District of Michigan case number 2:24-cv-10157 has been transferred to the District of Massachusetts and assigned civil action number: 1:24-cv-10645. In Re: MOVEit Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL 3083 (Danieli, Chris) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/15 12:00 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 03/15 11:53 AM
Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:24-cv-10157. |
|
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 MDL Certified Transfer Order (CTO-28) to District of Massachusetts for MDL # 3083. (VLun) | |
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell Capp on behalf of Beaumont Health. (Capp, Mitchell) | |
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Lowe on behalf of Beaumont Health. (Lowe, Timothy) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Latiff on behalf of Beaumont Health. (Latiff, Michael) | |
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-28) for MDL # 3083. [Informational Copy] (SSch) | |
Monday, January 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Welltok, Inc. waiver sent on 1/23/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. (Lyon, Joseph) | |
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch) | |
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DJen) | |
1 | 1 62 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey Weaver against Beaumont nka Corewell Health, Progress Software Corporation, Welltok, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9630069 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Middlesex County, MA. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Michigan, 2 24-10053 Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey ] (Lyon, Joseph) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Breach Notice | ||
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DJen) |