U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF10 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-FF10 v. Arch Mortgage Assurance Company et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret R Guzman |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-40042 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Arch Mortgage Assurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Heirs, Devisees, and Legal Representatives of the Estate of Gordon R. Terry
|
|
Defendant
Massachusetts Department of Revenue (Estate Tax Division)
|
|
Defendant
Heather Terry
|
|
Defendant
Kathleen Terry
|
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
|
Plaintiff
U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Holders of the First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-FF10 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-FF10
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
State Court Record - answer filed in state court
Thu 04/11 11:46 AM
STATE COURT Record.(Stoner, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Worcester Superior Court Records | ||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 03/22 9:53 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 5/3/2024. (Castles, Martin) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 03/21 5:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/03/2024 to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Stoner, Sarah) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Mon 03/18 10:29 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Barrows, Jennifer) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 03/18 9:32 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL re1 Notice of Removal: The Category form filed with the Notice of Removal indicates there are pending motions that need this court's attention. Please re-file any pending motions from State Court into this District Court Record. (Barrows, Jennifer) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Mon 03/18 9:30 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Barrows, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/15 1:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Fee Status: US Government)(Stoner, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint Served to USA, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form Category Form, | ||
Att: 4 Category Form List of Pending Motions, | ||
Att: 5 Category Form Copy of Pending Motion |