Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-02893

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00076
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sofi Lending Corp.
1201 Hays Street
Tallahassee, FL 32301
Represented By
Sofi Lending Corp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Christine Herendeen, Christine L. Herendeen as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Sean W. Maloney
P.O. Box 152348
Tampa, FL 33684
Represented By
Kellie O'Connell
Shrader Mendez & O'Connell
contact info
Brian L Shrader
Shrader Mendez & O'Connell
contact info
Alejandro J Mendez
Shrader Mendez & O'Connell
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
13 13 court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select) Wed 01/22 5:14 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by EM. Receipt Number 80003105. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
12 12 order Virtual Order Administratively Closing Adversary Proceeding (TEXT ONLY) Wed 08/28 8:56 AM
Order Administratively Closing Adversary Proceeding. On June 27, 2024, the Court entered an order approving the parties' compromise or settlement agreement in the main bankruptcy case, Doc. No. 24. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this adversary proceeding is administratively closed. This order is without prejudice to any party's moving to reopen the adversary proceeding for the purpose of seeking relief in connection with matters or disputes arising from or related to the compromise or settlement agreement. SO ORDERED by Judge Catherine Peek McEwen (text-only order). Related Bankruptcy Case Number: 8:23-bk-02893-CPM. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/28 8:58 AM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-76 Closed. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Thu 07/25 3:31 PM
Change of Address submitted to the Court on July 23, 2024, by Attorney Alejandro J. Mendez of Shrader Mendez & O'Connell - 902 N. Armenia Ave - Tampa, FL 33609. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation (AP) Fri 07/19 1:31 PM
Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Alejandro J Mendez on behalf of Plaintiff Christine L Herendeen. (Mendez, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
court Compromise Cross-Reference Fri 06/28 9:23 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:23-bk-02893-CPM, Doc. No. 24 . (Brenton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Tue 06/25 11:18 AM
Change of Address submitted to the Court on June 24, 2024, by Attorney Alejandro J. Mendez of Shrader Mendez & O'Connell - P.O. Box 311603 - Tampa, FL 33680. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
court Compromise Cross-Reference Mon 06/03 10:45 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:23-bk-02893-CPM, Doc. No. 22 . (Deborah K.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Thu 05/16 3:04 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by Alejandro J Mendez on behalf of Plaintiff Christine Herendeen. (Mendez, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
9 9 misc Disclosure (AP) Tue 04/30 4:11 PM
Disclosure Filed by Alejandro J Mendez on behalf of Plaintiff Christine Herendeen. (Mendez, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Thu 04/25 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #7 )
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Mon 04/22 1:47 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/5/2024 at 10:00 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/17 1:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kristina Y Lunsford on behalf of Defendant Sofi Lending Corp.. (Lunsford, Kristina)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 04/17 1:52 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: Social Finance, Inc.. Filed by Kristina Y Lunsford on behalf of Defendant Sofi Lending Corp.. (Lunsford, Kristina)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/17 1:50 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Kristina Y Lunsford on behalf of Defendant Sofi Lending Corp.. (Lunsford, Kristina)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Tue 03/19 12:36 PM
Service Executed on Sofi Lending Corp. of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Alejandro J Mendez on behalf of Plaintiff Christine Herendeen. (Mendez, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/18 1:56 PM
Summons issued on Sofi Lending Corp. along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 04/17/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Fri 03/15 10:17 AM
Complaint by Christine Herendeen against Sofi Lending Corp.. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Mendez, Alejandro)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other