Cohan v. GLO HOTEL OWNER LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00518 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 2:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
GLO HOTEL OWNER LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respoth
Answer to court interrogatories
Mon 04/01 8:52 AM
ANSWER to court interrogatories by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Photographs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Pacer Search | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons returned executed
Mon 03/25 9:40 AM
RETURN of service executed on 3/22/2024 by Howard Cohan as to Glo Hotel Owner LLC. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
7
pgs
order
Order setting status conference
Tue 03/19 2:17 PM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Conference set for 9/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/19/2024. (RMF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Tue 03/19 2:15 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/19/2024. (RMF) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/18 11:39 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Howard Cohan. (Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/18 9:45 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Glo Hotel Owner LLC. (MCB) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/15 2:56 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-518-WWB-RMN. (AA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT against GLO HOTEL OWNER LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21875177) filed by Howard Cohan.(Sconzo, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |