Mack v. Meseret Consulting, Inc. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00672 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Nahom Alemseghed
|
|
Defendant
Meseret Consulting, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Brittney Mack
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 04/16 1:58 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nahom Alemseghed, Meseret Consulting, Inc. (ABC) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Clerks Default
Tue 04/16 10:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk is directed to enter default against Meseret Consulting, Inc. and Nahom Alemseghed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/16/2024. (CES) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Clerks Default
Tue 04/16 10:25 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Default against Nahom Alemseghed, Meseret Consulting, Inc. by Brittney Mack.(Longman, Troy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 03/20 11:24 AM
RETURN of service executed on March 19, 2024 by Brittney Mack as to Nahom Alemseghed. (Longman, Troy) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons returned executed
Wed 03/20 11:23 AM
RETURN of service executed on March 19, 2024 by Brittney Mack as to Meseret Consulting, Inc.. (Longman, Troy) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Mon 03/18 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (ABC) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 03/18 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Troy Edward Longman, II on behalf of Brittney Mack. Lead Counsel: Troy Longman, II. (Longman, Troy) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 03/18 8:48 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Troy Edward Longman, II, Wolfgang M. Florin of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EAM) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/18 8:47 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Nahom Alemseghed, Meseret Consulting, Inc. (EAM) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/15 2:12 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-672-TPB-AAS. (AJS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21875156) filed by Brittney Mack.(Longman, Troy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |