Hauber v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Kathryn Kimball Mizelle |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00673 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Capital One, N.A.
|
|
Defendant
Citibank, N.A.
|
|
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mission Lane LLC
|
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Evan Simon Hauber
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
47 | 47
order
Order
Thu 04/25 12:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff announces (Doc. 45 ) a settlement as to Defendant Trans Union, LLC, only. Under Local Rule 3.09(b), the claims against Trans Union are DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days (1) to submit a stipulated form of final order or (2) to move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The Clerk is directed to terminate Trans Union, LLC, from the case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/25/2024. (CMM) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
notice
Notice of settlement
Wed 04/24 8:59 PM
NOTICE of settlement as to Trans Union LLC by Evan Simon Hauber (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
44 | 44
order
Order
Wed 04/24 9:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff announces (Doc. 41 ) a settlement as to Defendant Capital One, N.A., only. Under Local Rule 3.09(b), the claims against Capital One are DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days (1) to submit a stipulated form of final order or (2) to move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The Clerk is directed to terminate Capital One, N.A., from the case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/24/2024. (CMM) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
46 | 46
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 12:11 PM
ORDER directing parties to submit a Case Management Report within 7 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/23/2024. (KMN) |
|
43 | 43
notice
Notice of Hearing - Cancel
Tue 04/23 2:10 PM
NOTICE canceling Case Management Conference hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 as Plaintiff has objected to the IDEAL Program. (KMN) |
|
42 | 42
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/23 12:37 PM
NOTICE of filing Objection to the IDEAL Program by Evan Simon Hauber (Gomez, Octavio) Modified on 4/24/2024 to edit docket text (EAM) |
|
41 | 41
notice
Notice of settlement
Tue 04/23 12:15 PM
NOTICE of settlement as to Capital One, N.A. by Evan Simon Hauber (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order
Tue 04/23 9:11 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff announces (Doc. 39 ) a settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC, only. Under Local Rule 3.09(b), the claims against Equifax are DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days (1) to submit a stipulated form of final order or (2) to move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The Clerk is directed to terminate Equifax Information Services, LLC, from the case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/23/2024. (CMM) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice of settlement
Mon 04/22 9:23 PM
NOTICE of settlement as to Equifax Information Services LLC by Evan Simon Hauber (Kerney, Frank) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/17 4:34 PM
ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply( Responses due by 5/23/2024); granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Citibank, N.A. answer or response due 5/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/17/2024. (KMN) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 04/16 3:18 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Citibank, N.A.. Related case(s): No (Pillay, Chantal) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 3:18 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Citibank, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate Citigroup Inc. for Citibank, N.A.. (Pillay, Chantal) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Tue 04/16 3:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Citibank, N.A.. (Pillay, Chantal) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 04/16 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Charles Wilson on behalf of Citibank, N.A. (Wilson, Andrew) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 04/16 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Louis M. Ursini, III on behalf of Citibank, N.A. (Ursini, Louis) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/16 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance and Lead Counsel Designation by Chantal Pillay on behalf of Citibank, N.A. Lead Counsel: Chantal M. Pillay. (Pillay, Chantal) Modified docket text on 4/16/2024 (JOS) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 04/15 9:30 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 9:27 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/15 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Maria Helena Ruiz on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Maria H. Ruiz. (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of appearance
Mon 04/15 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Helena Ruiz on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Ruiz, Maria) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/12 9:15 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2024 at 11:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (KMN) |
|
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/12 9:14 AM
ORDER scheduling Case Management Conference regarding IDEAL Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/11/2024. (KMN) |
|
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/12 9:11 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/11/2024. (KMN) |
|
24 | 24
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 04/11 2:47 PM
RETURN of service executed on 04/02/2024 by Evan Simon Hauber as to Citibank, N.A.. (Kerney, Frank) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/11 9:22 AM
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Capital One, N.A. answer or response due 5/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/10/2024. (KMN) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Long, Charlotte) |
|
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/10 4:02 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Long, Charlotte) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 04/10 4:01 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Trans Union LLC. Related case(s): No (Long, Charlotte) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/10 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Charlotte A. Long on behalf of Trans Union LLC. Lead Counsel: Charlotte Long. (Long, Charlotte) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 7:29 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Capital One, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One, N.A.. (Williston, Gillian) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 04/09 7:26 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Capital One, N.A.. Related case(s): No (Williston, Gillian) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/09 7:25 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gillian DiFilippo Williston on behalf of Capital One, N.A.. Lead Counsel: Gillian D. Williston. (Williston, Gillian) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Tue 04/09 7:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Capital One, N.A.. (Williston, Gillian) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/09 7:20 PM
NOTICE by Capital One, N.A. re13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint to strike ECF 13 (Williston, Gillian) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Tue 04/09 7:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Capital One, N.A.. (Williston, Gillian) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons returned executed
Thu 03/28 1:00 PM
RETURN of service executed on 03/20/2024 by Evan Simon Hauber as to Trans Union LLC. (Kerney, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 03/26 8:47 AM
RETURN of service executed on 03/20/2024 by Evan Simon Hauber as to Capital One, N.A.. (Kerney, Frank) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of service executed
Thu 03/21 12:30 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/21/2024 by Evan Simon Hauber as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Kerney, Frank) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/19 11:13 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Evan Simon Hauber. (Kerney, Frank) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 03/19 11:12 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Evan Simon Hauber. Related case(s): No (Kerney, Frank) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 03/19 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Frank H. Kerney, III on behalf of Evan Simon Hauber. Lead Counsel: Frank H. Kerney, III. (Kerney, Frank) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/18 2:11 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Capital One, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Mission Lane LLC, Trans Union LLC. (GL) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Mon 03/18 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (KMN) |
|
5 | 5
order
Standing Order
Mon 03/18 4:48 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 3/15/2024. (KMN) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/15 2:20 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Octavio Gomez and Frank Kerney of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/15 2:20 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-673-KKM-TGW. (ARL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21875348) filed by Evan Simon Hauber.(Kerney, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons as to Equifax, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons as to Experian, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons as to Trans Union, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons as to Capital One, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons as to Citibank, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons as to Mission Lane |