Stine v. Novo Nordisk A/S et al.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James S Gwin |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00487 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Novo Nordisk A/S
|
|
Defendant
Novo Nordisk North America Operations A/S
|
|
Defendant
Novo Nordisk US Commercial
|
|
Defendant
Novo Nordisk US Holdings Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
John S Stine
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 04/05 9:59 AM
Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 8) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL No. 3094 Glucagon-like Peptide-1 Receptor Agonists (GLP-1 RAS) Products Liability Litigation. Case transferred to Eastern District of Pennsylvania and assigned to the Honorable Gene E.K. Pratter. (M,CE) |
|
oth_evt
Remark
Fri 04/05 10:58 AM
Case transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in Eastern District of Pennsylvania as case 2:24-cv-01432, filed 04/05/2024. Related document(s)6 . (R,AP) |
||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
Mon 04/01 9:51 AM
Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/1/24 granting plaintiff's5 Motion to withdraw. Attorney Stacy K. Hauer removed from case. (T,A) |
||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 03/29 1:04 PM
Motion by Stacy K. Hauer to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff John Stine. (Gorshe, Lisa) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Mon 03/25 10:45 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Emisphere Technologies, Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk Pharmaceutical Industries LP, Novo Nordisk Research Center Seattle, Inc., Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings Inc., Novo Nordisk US Holdings Inc. Related document3 . (R,AP) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
oth_doc
Praecipe
Fri 03/22 4:55 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by John Stine. Related document(s)1 .(Gorshe, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Summons for NN US Commercial Holdins, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons for NN Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons for NN US Holdings Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons for NN Research Center Seattle, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons for NN Pharmaceutical Industries, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Summons for Emisphere Tech | ||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
oth_evt
Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status
Mon 03/18 10:11 AM
Notice to Attorney Stacy K. Hauer. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo) |
||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake
Fri 03/15 3:47 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Incomplete summons received, no summons issued.) (E,CK) |
|
1 | 1
43
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 1:40 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12460277.. Filed by John S Stine. (Gorshe, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Fri 03/15 3:41 PM
Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (E,CK) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/15 3:46 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (E,CK) |