Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey J Helmick
Case #: 3:24-cv-00486
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Larry A. Figgins
Represented By
Brian P. Devaney
Rohrbacher Trimble & Zimmerman
contact info
Robert J. Bahret
Rohrbachers Cron Manahan Trimble Zimmerman - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
Candice Wrobel
Represented By
Michael A. Bruno
Law Office Of Charles E. Boyk
contact info
Andrea R. Young
Law Office Of Charles E. Boyk
contact info
Charles E. Boyk
Law Office Of Charles E. Boyk
contact info


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Deposition (atty event) Wed 03/26 9:59 AM
Notice to take Deposition of Candice Wrobel on April 3, 2025 at 1:00 PM filed by Larry A. Figgins. (Bahret, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Telephone Conference Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Order [non-document] of Telephone Conference held on 2/27/2025. Time: 5 minutes. Further Telephone Conference to be held on 7/30/2025, at 11:00 AM with counsel to call the court's bridge line at 419-718-0655, Meeting ID 849 763 788. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/27/2025. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
15 15 oth_doc Designation of Expert (atty event) Fri 12/06 5:19 PM
Designation of Expert filed by Larry A. Figgins. (House, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
14 14 2 pgs motion Order Wed 12/04 12:48 PM
Motion to Reschedule Mediation filed by Defendant Larry A. Figgins.(Bahret, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Referral Order Wed 12/04 3:27 PM
Order [non-document]: Based on the representations made in Defendant's motion to reschedule, I vacate the December 17, 2024 settlement conference, vacate the December 31, 2024 discovery deadline, terminate the referral to United States Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay, and set a telephone conference for 2/27/2025 at 10:30 AM. To join the conference, counsel shall call the court's bridge line at 419-718-0655, Meeting ID 849 763 788. re10 ,14 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/4/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 10/11 3:59 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document]: Telephone Conference held on 10/8/2024 before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. Time: 5 minutes. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Wed 10/02 4:00 PM
Order [non-document]: Due to Plaintiff's counsel's failure to timely appear for the October 1, 2024 telephone status conference, it is vacated and reset for October 8, 2024, at 02:00 PM. To join, counsel shall call the court's bridge line at 877-411-9748, access code 1231873. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 10/1/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Suggestion of Death (atty event) Wed 09/18 10:45 AM
Notice of Suggestion of Death filed by Larry A. Figgins. (Bahret, Robert)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Wed 09/18 4:06 PM
Notice [non-document]: Telephone Conference set for 10/1/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. Counsel to call the court's bridge line at 877-411-9748, access code 1231873. Related document(s)13 . (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 08/20 3:38 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bruno, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
11 11 6 pgs order Order Fri 05/24 11:32 AM
Order. Settlement Conference set for 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 408. Ex parte settlement statements shall be submitted by email to Clay_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov by 12/3/2024. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 5/24/2024. (R,Ke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
10 10 order Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Thu 05/23 3:41 PM
Order of Case Management Conference held on 5/23/2024. Time: 10 minutes. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 12/31/2024. Case is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for an initial settlement conference or mediation to be held in person in December of 2024 or January of 2025 at the convenience of the court and the parties. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 5/23/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
9 9 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Thu 05/16 9:35 AM
Initial Disclosures filed by Larry A. Figgins. (Bahret, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 05/16 9:11 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Larry A. Figgins. (Bahret, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 motion Strike Wed 04/24 9:19 AM
Motion to strike appearance of attorney Brian P. Devaney filed by Defendant Larry A. Figgins. (Bahret, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order for Motion to Strike Attorney Appearance
minutes ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Wed 04/24 10:40 AM
Order [non-document] removing attorney Brian P. Devaney as Defendant's counsel. re4 ,7 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 4/24/2024. (M,SM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
6 6 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Mon 04/22 9:17 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice : Case management conference to be held on 5/23/2024, at 09:30 AM in Chambers 210 before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick.(M,SM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
oth_evt Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Mon 04/22 3:25 PM
Notice to Attorney Brian P. Devaney. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Fri 04/19 2:22 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs filed by Larry A. Figgins. (Bahret, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/19 2:20 PM
Answer to1 Complaint filed by Larry A. Figgins. (Bahret, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Fri 03/15 2:43 PM
Supplement to Complaint - Redacted Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)1 . (Bruno, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 03/15 1:36 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Larry A. Figgins. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/15 12:36 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Larry A Figgins. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12460129. Filed by Candice Wrobel. (Bruno, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons-Larry A. Figgins
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 03/15 1:30 PM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 03/15 1:31 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Fri 03/15 1:37 PM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (R,EM)
Related: [-]