Weekend Warrior Clothing, LLC v. Zazzle, Inc.
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffery P Hopkins |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00135 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2024 6:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Zazzle, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Zazzle Holdings Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Weekend Warrior Clothing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/15 11:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Zazzle, Inc. on 3/21/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Franke, Gary) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Fri 03/22 5:20 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Weekend Warrior Clothing, LLC. . (Franke, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Works Part One, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Works Part Two, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Works Part Three, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Catalog, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Remaining Designs | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Non-Compliance of Local Rule 5.1(c) (Clerk's Notice)
Fri 03/22 4:21 PM
Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket4 Amended Complaint, filed by Weekend Warrior Clothing, LLC., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket4 Amended Complaint, filed by Weekend Warrior Clothing, LLC. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 3/25/2024. (bjc) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/22 12:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Zazzle Holdings Inc., Zazzle, Inc., filed by Weekend Warrior Clothing, LLC. (Franke, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Works Part One, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Works Part Two, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Works Part Three, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Catalog, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Remaining Designs | ||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 03/20 3:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Zazzle, Inc., Zazzle Holdings Inc., filed by Weekend Warrior Clothing, LLC. (Franke, Gary) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 12:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Zazzle, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9868619), filed by Weekend Warrior Clothing, LLC. (Franke, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Part One, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Part Two, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Part Three, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 03/15 2:55 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh) |