United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC et al v. Owens Corning Insulating Systems, LLC
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01213 |
Nature of Suit | 720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations |
Cause | 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2024 6:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Owens Corning Insulating Systems, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United Steelworkers Local 244M
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 3:26 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of MatthewLutwen and Cassandra Maas as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on April 17, 2024. (jlk) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 5:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9922956) of Matthew Lutwen and Cassandra Maas by Plaintiffs United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, United Steelworkers Local 244M. (Gallagher, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Lutwen Certificate of Good Standing), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Maas Certificate of Good Standing) | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 03/27 2:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Owens Corning Insulating Systems, LLC on 3/15/2024, answer due 5/14/2024. (Gallagher, Timothy) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Owens Corning Insulating Systems, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9869289), filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO/CLC, United Steelworkers Local 244M. (Gallagher, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Collective Bargaining Agreement), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Grievance), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Arbitration Award), | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |