Texas Western District Court
Judge:Susan Hightower
Case #: 1:24-cv-00284
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 5:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Polytec Inc
Represented By
Bret Allan Sanders
Fee, Smith & Sharp, LLP
contact info
Maria Laura Sigaud Hernandez
Fee, Smith, & Sharp LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Karp
Fee, Smith, Sharp & Vitullo, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Leonard Ekberg
Represented By
Lisa A. Snead
Edwards Law
contact info
Paul G Samuel
Edwards Law
contact info
David Anthony James
Edwards Law
contact info
Jeffrey S. Edwards
Edwards Law
contact info
Michael Singley
Edwards Law
contact info

GPO May 29 2024
Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/14/2024. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm)
GPO Jun 11 2024
ORDER DENYING 6 Motion to Amend Complaint; DENYING 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
25 25 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/28 2:31 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
24 24 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 03/07 10:08 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Leonard Ekberg.(Samuel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 03/07 10:22 AM
Text Order GRANTING24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge Susan Hightower. Plaintiff shall file his designation of testifying experts and serve the materials required by Rule 26(a)(2)(B) by March 14, 2025; Defendant shall file his designation of testifying experts and serve the materials required by Rule 26(a)(2)(B) by April 12, 2025; and the parties shall complete discovery by April 18, 2025. All other deadlines remain as set. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (SH)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/10 10:10 AM
Reset Deadline: Discovery due by 4/18/2025 (cc3)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 01/27 2:23 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 26, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/27 2:22 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Susan Hightower. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to the case. (cc3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
22 22 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 01/24 5:13 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Leonard Ekberg. (Edwards, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice Fri 01/24 12:24 PM
NOTICE Concerning Reference to United States Magistrate Judge by Polytec Inc (Hernandez, Maria Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
20 20 adr ADR Report - Other Fri 11/08 5:10 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Leonard Ekberg(Edwards, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/02 3:05 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 1/24/2025, Jury Trial set for 9/15/2025 at 9:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, ADR Report Deadline due by 11/8/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2025, Discovery due by 4/11/2025, Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2025. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
18 18 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 07/02 2:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Hightower: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/1/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter AT&T Conference Line.)(dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 06/28 3:36 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan filed Jointly with Defendant by Leonard Ekberg. (Samuel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 06/21 9:20 AM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
15 15 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 06/11 4:31 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Leonard Ekberg. (Edwards, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Complaint Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 06/11 11:56 AM
ORDER DENYING6 Motion to Amend Complaint; DENYING8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Wed 05/29 2:30 PM
Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/14/2024. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/29 4:57 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Leonard Ekberg, re8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Leonard Ekberg (Samuel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/25 4:20 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Polytec Inc, re6 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Leonard Ekberg(Hernandez, Maria Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Monday, April 22, 2024
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/22 5:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Leonard Ekberg, re6 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Leonard Ekberg(Samuel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Letter to Polytec, Inc.s Insurer (September 12, 2022),
Att: 2 Exhibit Email from Polytec, Inc.s Insurer (February 14, 2024)
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/22 2:14 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Polytec Inc, re8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Leonard Ekberg(Hernandez, Maria Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 15, 2024
8 8 motion Remand to State Court Mon 04/15 7:04 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Leonard Ekberg.(Samuel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/15 5:26 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Polytec Inc, re6 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiff Leonard Ekberg(Hernandez, Maria Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 motion Amend Complaint Thu 04/04 6:35 PM
MOTION to Amend Complaint by Leonard Ekberg.(Samuel, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit Ex. 1 - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Email Confirming Driver's Identity
Thursday, March 28, 2024
5 5 misc Supplement to Thu 03/28 4:11 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal by Polytec Inc.(Hernandez, Maria Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 18, 2024
4 4 service Certificate of Service Mon 03/18 11:53 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Polytec Inc CORRECTED 1 Notice of Removal (Hernandez, Maria Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/18 8:35 AM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Deficiency Notice Mon 03/18 8:34 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Removal, your Certificate of Service indicates ECF service on attorney for Plaintiff, who had not been added to the docket at the time of filing the Notice of Removal, and therefore had not been served via CM/ECF. Please file an Amended Certificate of Service as a SEPARATE PLEADING. Use the "Certificate of Service" event under the "Service of Process" menu. State alternate means of service to counsel. (kp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/15 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Polytec Inc (Filing fee $405 receipt number BTXWDC-18535278), filed by Polytec Inc.(Sanders, Bret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/18 8:31 AM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 03/18 8:32 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 03/18 8:32 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leonard Ekberg, Polytec Inc. (kp)
Related: [-]