Barnes v. UPS et al
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Alexander C Ekstrom |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00081 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 11:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
UPS
|
|
Defendant
UPS Beoing Field
|
|
Defendant
UPS Seattle
|
|
Plaintiff
Darene Barnes
1100 Bellevue Way NE 945
Bellevue, WA 98004 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Supplement
Tue 04/09 1:49 PM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint by Darene Barnes.(LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Envelope | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Supplement
Mon 04/08 9:59 AM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint by Darene Barnes.(LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Envelope | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order IFP -DENIED - non-prisoner
Mon 03/25 11:17 AM
ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals that the information in the application fails to include living expenses and is not clear who the child support income benefits. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 4/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 03/21 2:09 PM
Civil Cover Sheet (unsigned) filed in response to Clerk's Notice of Deficient Filing by Darene Barnes. (WMK, Case Administrator) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Receipt of Signature Page (Ex Parte or Public)
Thu 03/21 2:04 PM
Notice of Receipt of Signature Page Re1 Complaint. (WMK, Case Administrator) (WMK, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 (3/21/2024) Transmittal Envelope | ||
4 | 4
notice
Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/21 1:53 PM
Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 4/1/2024. (WMK, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerk's Notice of Deficient Filing
Fri 03/15 9:44 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING re1 Complaint. Summons and Complaint unsigned/incomplete. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 9:02 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (unsigned) (Filing Fee $405, Receipt # IFP Pending) Filed by Darene Barnes.(LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet (unsigned), | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons (incomplete) |