California Central District Court
Judge:Dean D Pregerson
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:24-cv-02131
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Terminated:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 2:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Gustavo Rivera Madrid
Represented By
Jonathan Pearce
Socal Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Michael D. Harris
Socal Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
Marae Kay Onsgard
Represented By
Jonathan Pearce
Socal Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Michael D. Harris
Socal Ip Law Group LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Leslie Werlin
Represented By
Leslie M Werlin
Law Office Of Leslie Werlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Dental Supply Inc.
Represented By
Jason Frederick Lowe
Law Offices Of Jason Lowe
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, January 03, 2025
27 27 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 01/03 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error,26 : The incorrect document was dockete4d in this case and should have been docketed in case no. 2:23cv01567CAS (PVC) Grapery Inc v Bloom Fresh Int'l Ltd. (shb)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/03 1:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULE,25 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation and ORDERS the following modified case schedule Status Conference Re Settlement - 1/6/2025 at 11:00 a.m. PT (by Zoom); ; Fact Discovery Cutoff - 3/18/2025; Disclosure of Opening Experts- 4/8/2025; Disclosure of Rebuttal Experts - 5/6/2025; Expert Discovery Cutoff - 5/27/2025; Last Day to FileDispositive and Daubert Motions - 6/24/2025; Pretrial Conference - 9/15/2025; Trial - 10/7/2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
25 25 stip Dismiss Case Tue 12/31 10:01 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by plaintiff Dental Supply Inc..(Lowe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
24 24 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Tue 08/06 12:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Leslie Werlin has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/09 11:11 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b), the Court issues the following Order: Counsel must agree on the date for the disclosure of expert witness reports pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(a)2. Counsel are ordered to abide by the dates as set forth in the Rule 26 (f) Report. LAST DAY TO JOIN OTHER PARTIES AND TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS: September 6, 2024; FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF: January 3, 2025; EXPERT DISCLOSURE CUT-OFF: February 14, 2025; EXPERT REBUTTAL CUT-OFF: March 14, 2025; EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF: April 11, 2025; LAST DAY TO FILE MOTIONS: June 16, 2025; FINAL PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE: August 25, 2025, at 11:00 a.m.; 3-7 DAY JURY TRIAL: September 9, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. (shb)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Tue 07/09 10:57 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 31, 2025. (shb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 07/05 8:56 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. The 7/8/2024 Scheduling Conference17 , at 11:00 AM, is hereby vacated and taken OFF CALENDAR. The Court finds the Joint Report18 20 in order. No appearance necessary on 7/8/2024. The Courts Scheduling Order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 07/05 6:38 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Plaintiff Dental Supply Inc... (Lowe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
19 19 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 07/03 4:46 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Report18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Other Filings Pretrial and Trial Documents - Select - Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
18 18 misc Report Mon 07/01 2:08 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Dental Supply Inc.. (Lowe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 06/04 4:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO ADJOURN16 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2024. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
16 16 stip Reschedule Mon 06/03 2:52 PM
STIPULATION to Reschedule Scheduling Conference filed by plaintiff Dental Supply Inc..(Lowe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 29, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/30 4:38 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ( Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 04/26 2:44 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Gustavo Rivera Madrid, Marae Kay Onsgard, (Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 04/26 2:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Gustavo Rivera Madrid, Marae Kay Onsgard.(Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 04/08 11:58 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Marae Kay Onsgard answer now due 4/29/2024; Gustavo Rivera Madrid answer now due 4/29/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Marae Kay Onsgard; Gustavo Rivera Madrid.(Attorney Michael D. Harris added to party Gustavo Rivera Madrid(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D. Harris added to party Marae Kay Onsgard(pty:dft))(Harris, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 04/09 9:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel must refer to the Central Districts website at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov for Judge Dean D. Pregerson's Procedures and Schedules. Counsel must review the Court's Standing Order and CV Trial Order, and comply with the same. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing a motion. Counsel are required to comply with C.D. Cal. L.R. 5-4.4.1 through 5-4.4.2. See order for more information. (shb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
10 10 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/18 11:00 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dental Supply Inc.. (Lowe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
9 9 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Fri 03/15 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/15 3:19 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Marae Kay Onsgard. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/15 3:18 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Gustavo Rivera Madrid. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/15 2:52 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/15 2:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/15 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 03/15 11:54 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Frontier Dental Supply Inc., d/b/a MVP Dental Supplies. (Lowe, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Fri 03/15 11:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 Frontier Dental Supply Inc., d/b/a MVP Dental Supplies. (Lowe, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/15 11:51 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37102917 - Fee: $405, filed by Frontier Dental Supply Inc., d/b/a MVP Dental Supplies Frontier Dental Supply Inc., d/b/a MVP Dental Supplies. (Attorney Jason Frederick Lowe added to party Frontier Dental Supply Inc., d/b/a MVP Dental Supplies(pty:pla))(Lowe, Jason)
Related: [-]