OPR Limited Partnership et al. v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey M Bryan |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-00948 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2024 3:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miramar, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
OPR Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Redacted Document (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Mon 04/22 10:36 AM
Redacted Document for14 Sealed Supplemental Declaration of M. Mitchell Rotenberg . (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Redacted Document (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Fri 04/19 12:38 PM
Redacted Document for14 Sealed Supplemental Declaration of M. Mitchell Rotenberg . (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 1:12 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. re Citizenship of Plaintiff OPR Limited Partnership . (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Sealed Document
Thu 04/18 12:52 PM
SEALED Supplemental Declaration of M. Mitchell Rotenberg re10 Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail by American Family. (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail
Mon 04/15 5:01 PM
ORDER in Response to12 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/15/2024. (TJB) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/12 2:04 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. . (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Declaration
Fri 04/12 1:56 PM
DECLARATION of Dennis Anderson re8 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. . (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail
Fri 04/12 11:15 AM
ORDER in Response to9 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/12/2024. (TJB) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/11 9:48 AM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by OPR Limited Partnership . (Krco, David) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court
Thu 03/28 1:40 PM
ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/28/2024. (TJB) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/25 10:25 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for Miramar, Inc., OPR Limited Partnership. (Krco, David) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/25 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David J Krco on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Krco, David) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/22 1:28 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Fri 03/15 2:43 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-948 (JMB/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 03/15 1:33 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/15 1:30 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/15 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-CV 24-1165 (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-10909211) filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. No summons requested. (Anderson, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Other State Court Pleadings and Process, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Affidavit of M. Mitchell Rotenberg, | ||
Att: 5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |