New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Case #: 1:24-cv-01927
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Joseph DeWoody
Represented By
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kristin Whitley
Represented By
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ken Rice
Defendant
Mia Pitts
Represented By
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
George Palikaras
Defendant
Delvina Oelkers
Represented By
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc.
Represented By
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gregory McCabe
Represented By
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lucas T. Hawkins
Represented By
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Clifton Dubose, Jr.
Represented By
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert L. Cook
Represented By
Abby Faith Rudzin
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Inter-Coastal Waterways, LLC
5 Seafarers Circle
Savannah, GA 31411
Represented By
Mark R. Basile
The Basile Law Firm P.C.
contact info
Movant
Craig Brown
Represented By
Phillip Kim
The Rosen Law Firm
contact info
Movant
Mohammed Limon
Represented By
Adam Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Movant
Steven Martinez
Represented By
Adam Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Todd Targgart
Represented By
Adam Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
utility Transfer Case Opened Tue 08/13 4:22 PM
Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in in Northern District of Texas as case 4:24-cv-00767, filed 08/13/2024. (TLH)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
27 27 order Stipulation and Order Mon 08/12 5:09 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: Transferring this case to the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/12/2024. (MI)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Change Venue Mon 08/12 4:49 PM
Joint MOTION to Change Venue resolving Letter Motion 25 by Mohammed Limon, Steven Martinez, Todd Targgart. (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 08/12 5:03 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Dismissing as moot defendant's letter application25 requesting a pre-motion conference seeking to make a motion to transfer this case to the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. See entry26 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/12/2024. (MI)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Change Venue Mon 08/12 5:06 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting the parties joint application26 to transfer this case to the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/12/2024. (MI)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Mon 08/12 5:11 PM
Case transferred to the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/12/2024. (MI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
25 25 motion Pre Motion Conference Tue 08/06 6:03 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Robert L. Cook, Joseph DeWoody, Clifton Dubose, Jr, Lucas T. Hawkins, Gregory McCabe, Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc., Delvina Oelkers, Mia Pitts, Kristin Whitley. (Rudzin, Abby)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abby Faith Rudzin on behalf of Robert L. Cook, Joseph DeWoody, Clifton Dubose, Jr, Lucas T. Hawkins, Gregory McCabe, Delvina Oelkers, Mia Pitts, Kristin Whitley (aty to be noticed) (Rudzin, Abby)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 03, 2024
23 23 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Sat 08/03 8:29 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum & Order, this Court appoints the NBH Investor Group-comprising Plaintiff Todd Targgart, Steven Martinez, and Mohammed Limon-as lead plaintiffs and Levi & Korsinsky, LLP, as lead counsel. Movant Craig Brown's application at Dkt. No.12 is denied as moot in light of the withdrawal in Dkt. No.18 . By August 19, 2024 , Lead Counsel and counsel for Defendants shall meet and confer regarding scheduling and shall thereafter file a proposed order stating the deadline by which (a) Lead Plaintiff will file an amended complaint (if any), and (b) the date by which Defendants will file a responsive pleading. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 8/3/2024. (LCPL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
22 22 notice Notice(Other) Tue 06/25 5:15 PM
NOTICE by Mohammed Limon, Steven Martinez, Todd Targgart re14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff re Subsequent Developments (SEC Enforcement Actions) (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Press Release,
Att: 2 Exhibit Cease and Desist Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Phone/Email Tue 06/11 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Address Once the filing has been made, you must login to www.pacer.gov and update your account. (Rudzin, Abby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
20 20 notice Notice(Other) Wed 06/05 10:29 AM
NOTICE by Mohammed Limon, Steven Martinez, Todd Targgart re14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff - Notice of Unopposed Motion (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
19 19 respoth Reply in Support Tue 06/04 9:07 PM
REPLY in Support re14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Mohammed Limon, Steven Martinez, Todd Targgart. (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice(Other) Tue 06/04 3:49 PM
NOTICE by Craig Brown re12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL (Kim, Phillip)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Basile on behalf of Inter-Coastal Waterways, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Basile, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
16 16 10 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Tue 05/28 9:46 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Mohammed Limon, Steven Martinez, Todd Targgart. (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
15 15 11 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Tue 05/28 6:38 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Craig Brown. (Kim, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
order Order(Other) Wed 05/15 10:16 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Referring movant Craig Brown's motion12 and movant Todd Targgart, Steven Martinez and Mohammed Limon joint motion14 to be appointed lead counsel and lead plaintiff to MJ Marutollo to decide. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/15/2024. (MI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
14 14 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 05/14 10:44 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Todd Targgart, Steven Martinez, Mohammed Limon. (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Declaration of Adam M. Apton,
Att: 4 Exhibit A- PSLRA Certifications,
Att: 5 Exhibit B- Loss Chart,
Att: 6 Exhibit C- PSLRA Notice,
Att: 7 Exhibit D- Joint Declaration,
Att: 8 Exhibit E- Firm Resume
13 13 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 05/14 10:14 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Craig Brown. (Kim, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Rosen Law Firm Resume
12 12 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 05/14 10:11 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Craig Brown. (Kim, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 06, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/06 1:26 PM
Case to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (BBM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Fri 05/03 9:32 AM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (EG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Thu 05/02 5:12 PM
Letter Motion to Reassign Case addressed to the Clerk of the Court regarding EDNY Pilot Program by Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc. (Rudzin, Abby)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/23 2:12 PM
Order granting10 . Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint is adjourned sine die. Under the PSLRA, any motion to serve as lead plaintiff shall be filed by May 14, 2024. See 15 U.S.C. § 78u-4(a)(3)(A)(i). The parties shall advise if they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction by April 25, 2024. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The consent form is available at4 and also available here:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/23/2024. (EG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/11 11:04 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc.. (Rudzin, Abby)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/11 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abby Faith Rudzin on behalf of Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Rudzin, Abby)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/27 2:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Targgart. Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc. served on 3/22/2024, answer due 4/12/2024. (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 03/22 2:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Robert L. Cook, Joseph DeWoody, Clifton Dubose, Jr, Lucas T. Hawkins, Gregory McCabe, Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc., Delvina Oelkers, George Palikaras, Mia Pitts, Ken Rice, Kristin Whitley. (IH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/15 3:55 PM
Proposed Summons. by Todd Targgart (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 03/15 3:30 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Fri 03/15 3:29 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/15 3:15 PM
Proposed Summons. by Todd Targgart (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/15 3:12 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Todd Targgart (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/15 3:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Robert L. Cook, Joseph DeWoody, Clifton Dubose, Jr, Lucas T. Hawkins, Gregory McCabe, Next Bridge Hydrocarbons, Inc., Delvina Oelkers, George Palikaras, Mia Pitts, Ken Rice, Kristin Whitley filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17673134 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Todd Targgart. (Apton, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CERTIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Fri 03/15 3:32 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The full case caption must appear on the summons., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]