Lopez et al v. Orange Lantern, Inc.
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Mark G Mastroianni |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-30035 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 4:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Orange Lantern, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jaime Middleton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arianny Celeste Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Milani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andra Cheri Moreland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lyna Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lucy Pinder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lina Posada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abigail Ratchford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danielle Ruiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ina Schnitzer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Stage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaclyn Swedberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hillary Fisher Vinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosie Wicks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chantel Zales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanna Krupa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julianne Klaren
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Iglesias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Hobbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Krystal Forscutt Hipwell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Hinton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emma Glover
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Geiger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamillette Gaxiola
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaime Edmondson-Longoria
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iesha Marie Crespo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelby Chesnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Cerny
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Burciaga
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Monson on behalf of Orange Lantern, Inc. (Monson, Christopher) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Monson on behalf of Orange Lantern, Inc. (Monson, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Thu 04/04 11:24 AM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John V. Golaszewski. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Figueroa, Tamara) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/26 2:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John Golaszewski Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10335271 by Rosa Acosta, Jessica Burciaga, Amanda Cerny, Shelby Chesnes, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Jamillette Gaxiola, Brenda Geiger, Emma Glover, Tiffany Gray, Jessica Hinton, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Ashley Hobbs, Melanie Iglesias, Julianne Klaren, Joanna Krupa, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Jaime Middleton, Denise Milani, Andra Cheri Moreland, Lyna Perez, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, Abigail Ratchford, Danielle Ruiz, Ina Schnitzer, Sarah Stage, Jaclyn Swedberg, Hillary Fisher Vinson, Rosie Wicks, Chantel Zales.(Sullivan, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Attorney Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/22 10:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Orange Lantern, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Zamorski, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/22 10:51 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Healy, Bethaney) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10320005 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Rosa Acosta, Jessica Burciaga, Amanda Cerny, Shelby Chesnes, Iesha Marie Crespo, Jaime Edmondson-Longoria, Jamillette Gaxiola, Brenda Geiger, Emma Glover, Tiffany Gray, Jessica Hinton, Krystal Forscutt Hipwell, Ashley Hobbs, Melanie Iglesias, Julianne Klaren, Joanna Krupa, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Jaime Middleton, Denise Milani, Andra Cheri Moreland, Lyna Perez, Lucy Pinder, Lina Posada, Abigail Ratchford, Danielle Ruiz, Ina Schnitzer, Sarah Stage, Jaclyn Swedberg, Hillary Fisher Vinson, Rosie Wicks, Chantel Zales.(Sullivan, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Form |