Hudak v. CITIZENS BANK, N.A.,
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | David H Hennessy |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-40043 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 4:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
CITIZENS BANK, N.A.,
|
|
Plaintiff
Charlene Hudak
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/19 2:58 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response of Citizens Bank, N.A. due 4/30/2024. (King, Dawn) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 03/27 10:34 AM
Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re7 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The court acknowledges the parties' filing at docket number7 STIPULATION re1 Complaint, extending time to respond until April 30, 2024 by Citizens Bank, N.A. The court further advises that any enlargement of time allowed by the rules or the court's scheduling order shall be by motion only. (King, Dawn) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/26 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Citizens Bank, N.A. (Millsom, Geoffrey) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Tue 03/26 3:47 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, extending time to respond until April 30, 2024 by Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Force, Brenna) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/26 3:46 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citizens Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citizens Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Citizens Bank, N.A... (Force, Brenna) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/26 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brenna Anatone Force on behalf of Citizens Bank, N.A. (Force, Brenna) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff
Mon 03/18 8:21 AM
Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: docket entry 1 corrected because: The Notice of Appearance was incorrectly filed as an Exhibit/Attachment. The CM/ECF procedures require that a Notice of Appearance be filed separately and identified accordingly. Counsel is reminded to review the local rules and the attorney handbook when filing documents with the Court by accessing our web page, at www.mad.uscourts.gov under CM/ECF E-Filing. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/18 8:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Citizens Bank, N.A.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/18 8:17 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Burgos, Sandra) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT against CITIZENS BANK, N.A., Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10319635 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Charlene Hudak.(Ruggieri, Janet) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Appearance |