Ramos Quinn-Goncalves v. ICE Field Office
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Allison D Burroughs |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10653 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 4:10 PM EDT |
Petitioner
Igor Leandro Ramos Quinn-Goncalves
Strafford County Correctional Facility 266 County Farm Road
Dover, NH 03820 |
|
Respondent
ICE Field Office
|
GPO
Mar 15 2024
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. The Court orders that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire.(PSSA, 3) |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Filing Fee/Payment Received
Thu 03/21 2:08 PM
Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 100007006 for1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Phillips, Sophie) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misccs
Electronic Notice re transfer of civil action
Tue 03/19 11:43 AM
Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the District of New Hampshire and assigned civil case number 1:24-cv-00077. (Danieli, Chris) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Copy Mailed
Mon 03/18 10:28 AM
Copy re 4 Case Transferred Out - District Transfer,3 Order mailed to Igor Leandro Ramos Quinn-Goncalves on 3/18/2024. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Mon 03/18 8:53 AM
Case transferred to to District of New Hampshire. Case file sent electronically to Clerk in that district. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/18 8:09 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. The Court orders that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire.(PSSA, 3) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/15 3:33 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Horvath, Courtney) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241
Fri 03/15 3:22 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Igor Leandro Ramos Quinn-Goncalves.(Dore, Samantha) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments, | ||
Att: 2 Arguments, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit |