Taffer v Caroleo
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John E Steele |
Referred: | Kyle C Dudek |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00242 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Victor Caroleo
|
|
Plaintiff
Jon Taffer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of service executed
Wed 03/27 4:35 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/27/2024 by Jon Taffer as to Victor Caroleo. (McMullen, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/18 2:59 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Victor Caroleo. (GL) |
|
7 | 7
order
Civil Action Order
Mon 03/18 10:59 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/18/2024. (CGW) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/18 10:44 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR (GL) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 03/15 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bradford Cohen on behalf of Jon Taffer. Lead Counsel: Bradford M. Cohen. (Cohen, Bradford) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 03/15 3:52 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael McMullen and Bradford Cohen of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/15 3:51 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:24-cv-242-JES-KCD. (ARL) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed summons
Fri 03/15 3:26 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Jon Taffer. (Cohen, Bradford) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Victor Caroleo with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21876066) filed by Jon Taffer.(Cohen, Bradford) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |