Nevers v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Leslie Hoffman Price |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00523 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
|
|
Defendant
Roadmaster Drivers School Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Louiko Nevers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/08 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Reopen Case
Fri 04/05 3:44 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Louiko Nevers. (Lane, Gerald) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 04/05 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Gerald D Lane, Jr on behalf of Louiko Nevers. Lead Counsel: Gerald D Lane, Jr. (Lane, Gerald) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 04/05 3:41 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Louiko Nevers. Related case(s): No (Lane, Gerald) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 04/05 2:50 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Any motion for reconsideration must be filed within fourteen days of this order, comply with all Local Rules, and include the following: a certification that the lead attorney has personally read the Court's Initial Order and the Local Rules cited therein; an explanation for why the deadline was missed; and as separate docket entries, all missing filings. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/5/2024. (MEH) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/27 2:05 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Louiko Nevers. (Lane, Gerald) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Mon 03/18 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (ECJ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Mon 03/18 2:49 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/18/2024. (MEH) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/18 2:48 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/18/2024. (MEH) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Mon 03/18 10:55 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Experian Information Solutions Inc, Roadmaster Drivers School Inc. (LD) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/15 4:31 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-523-CEM-LHP. (AA) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions Inc, Roadmaster Drivers School Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21876061) filed by Louiko Nevers.(Simil, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons |