Rodriguez v. The Phoenix Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Referred: | Anthony E Porcelli |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00680 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
The Phoenix Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jenry Rodriguez
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Case Management Report
Fri 04/26 9:57 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Janousek, John) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 04/18 3:21 PM
NOTICE of a related action 2023 CA 008559 per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jenry Rodriguez. Related case(s): Yes (Gacio, Tomas) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 10:14 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jenry Rodriguez. (Gacio, Tomas) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/11 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Tomas L. Gacio on behalf of Jenry Rodriguez. Lead Counsel: Tomas L. Gacio. (Gacio, Tomas) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/29 1:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07 by The Phoenix Insurance Company. (Janousek, John) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 03/29 1:36 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by The Phoenix Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Janousek, John) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 03/29 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John Morgan Janousek on behalf of The Phoenix Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: John Janousek. (Janousek, John) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 2:18 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/21 2:17 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 10:03 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-680-TPB-AEP. (RPB) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/15 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, case number 2023-CA-8559 filed in State Court on March 22, 2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21877384 filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company.(Janousek, John) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 2 State Court ANSWER, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Police Report, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Medical Record with Plaintiff Address, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Citizenship of Defendant, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet |