Wisenbaugh v. Commissioner of Social Security
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sally J Berens |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00277 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of Social Security Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 03/27 11:14 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sarah E. Preston on behalf of defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Preston, Sarah) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/25 10:06 AM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) |
|
Saturday, March 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees
Sat 03/23 5:36 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Geelhoed, Thomas) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/18 9:58 AM
ORDER re2 that Plaintiff shall, within 7 days, submit an amended application with Plaintiff's manuscript signature; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Mon 03/18 8:58 AM
NOTICE regarding transmission of complaint, service and answer; that this case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (ns) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees
Fri 03/15 2:49 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Geelhoed, Thomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley filed by Daniel Wisenbaugh (Geelhoed, Thomas) |