Paige #211567 v. Yoder et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00274 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 03, 2024 |
defendant
J. Yoder
|
|
defendant
Unknown Party #1
|
|
defendant
Unknown Party #2
|
|
defendant
Unknown Party #3
|
|
plaintiff
Billy Joe Paige #211567
|
GPO
Apr 03 2024
OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) |
|
GPO
Apr 03 2024
JUDGMENT; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Wed 04/03 9:53 AM
JUDGMENT; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/03 9:53 AM
ORDER DENYING IFP; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) |
|
5 | 5
13
pgs
order
Opinion
Wed 04/03 9:52 AM
OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 04/03 12:36 PM
Copy of Opinion5 , Order6 , Judgment7 sent via U.S. Mail to Billy Joe Paige #211567 (slk) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case)
Wed 03/27 3:47 PM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Billy Joe Paige #211567 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (slk) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Supplement
Wed 03/27 3:44 PM
SUPPLEMENT re complaint1 by plaintiff Billy Joe Paige #211567 (slk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)
Fri 03/15 3:30 PM
NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 4/5/2024 (slk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Billy Joe Paige #211567 (slk) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 03/15 3:33 PM
Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas)2 sent via U.S. Mail to Billy Joe Paige (slk) |