New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:24-cv-01974
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 5:19 AM EDT
Defendant
L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas B. Mayhew
Farella Braun And Martel
contact info
Cynthia A Castillo
Farella Braun & Martel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayla Mraz
Represented By
Steven Sukert
Kopelowitz Ostrow PA
contact info
Jason Henry Alperstein
Carella Byrne Cecchi Brody & Agnello P.C.
contact info
James E. Cecchi
Carella, Byrne, Cechi, Olstein, Brody & Agnello, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 16, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/16 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) L'Oreal USA, Inc.. Document filed by Kayla Mraz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Sukert, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/08 10:48 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. 14 MOTION for Thomas B. Mayhew to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (bc)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Due Wed 05/08 10:50 AM
Pro Hac Vice Fee Due: for14 MOTION for Thomas B. Mayhew to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(bc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/07 11:51 PM
MOTION for Thomas B. Mayhew to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by L'Oreal USA, Inc...(Mayhew, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Thomas B. Mayhew,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Monday, April 15, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Henry Alperstein on behalf of Kayla Mraz..(Alperstein, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/15 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James E. Cecchi on behalf of Kayla Mraz..(Cecchi, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
11 11 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/10 9:45 AM
ORDER, Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation, the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to Friday, May 24, 2024. SO ORDERED. ( L'Oreal USA, Inc. answer due 5/24/2024.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/9/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/09 5:51 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent L'Oreal S.A. for L'Oreal USA, Inc.. Document filed by L'Oreal USA, Inc...(Castillo, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/09 5:44 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting7 Motion for Cynthia A. Castillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/9/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Letter Tue 04/09 5:41 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Cynthia A. Castillo dated April 9, 2024 re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by L'Oreal USA, Inc...(Castillo, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/09 3:11 PM
MOTION for Cynthia A. Castillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29195209. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by L'Oreal USA, Inc...(Castillo, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 04/09 3:25 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Cynthia A. Castillo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29195209. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 03/22 1:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L'Oreal USA, Inc. served on 3/20/2024, answer due 4/10/2024. Service was accepted by L'Oreal USA, Inc.. Document filed by Kayla Mraz..(Sukert, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 03/19 12:03 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to L'Oreal USA, Inc...(gp)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 03/19 9:32 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/31/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/19/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/18 4:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to L'Oreal USA, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kayla Mraz..(Sukert, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/18 4:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sukert, Steven)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/18 10:27 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 03/18 10:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/18 10:27 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 03/18 10:28 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Sukert. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kayla Miraz. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 03/18 10:28 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Sukert. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/18 10:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Steven Sukert to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/15 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT against L'Oreal USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29088086)Document filed by Kayla Miraz..(Sukert, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet