Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi K Dubose
Referred: William E Cassady
Case #: 2:24-cv-00082
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 4:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By
Katherine Edwards West Manning
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Robert Benjamin Reardon
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
J. Mark Hart
Hand Arendall Harrison
contact info
Plaintiff
Reginald Southall
Represented By
Edward P Kendall
Strickland & Kendall
contact info
Michael Glen Strickland
Strickland & Kendall, LLC
contact info
Edward Kendall
Strickland & Kendall, LLC
contact info
Sidney W. Jackson, III
Jackson & Foster, LLC
contact info
Christian W. Harben
Jackson & Foster, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Gulf Protection Group, Inc.
Terminated: 08/22/2024
Represented By
William F. Smith, II
Vernis & Bowling
contact info
Defendant
Russell Johnson
Terminated: 08/22/2024
Represented By
William F. Smith, II
Vernis & Bowling
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Waters Agency, LLC
Terminated: 08/22/2024
Represented By
William F. Smith, II
Vernis & Bowling
contact info
Defendant
James Chad Solomon
Terminated: 08/22/2024
Represented By
William F. Smith, II
Vernis & Bowling
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Waters
Terminated: 08/22/2024
Represented By
William F. Smith, II
Vernis & Bowling
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
48 48 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 05/07 10:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part46 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery cutoff is extended to 7/8/2025. Dispositive motions due by 7/22/2025. Motions attacking the testimony of expert witnesses are also due on 7/22/25. The remaining deadlines contained in the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order remain unchanged.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/7/25. (Cassady, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
47 47 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 05/06 12:52 PM
ORDER denying40 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Van Puffelen, as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/6/2025. (meh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
46 46 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/02 12:21 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time [Joint Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines] filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, Robert
utility Motions Referred Fri 05/02 2:01 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time [Joint Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines] - Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (nah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
45 45 respm Reply Brief Wed 04/30 3:01 PM
REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Frankie Shamburger, Reginald Southall re:40 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Van Puffelen filed by Frankie Shamburger, Reginald Southall. (Kendall, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EXHIBIT A,
Att: 2 EXHIBIT B,
Att: 3 EXHIBIT C,
Att: 4 EXHIBIT D
utility Document Referred Wed 04/30 5:03 PM
REFERRAL OF45 Reply Brief to Judge Cassady. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
44 44 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply Tue 04/22 9:22 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to42 Response to Motion,40 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Van Puffelen Replies due by 4/30/2025.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/22/25. (Cassady, William)
Related: [-]
43 43 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/22 9:00 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to42 Response to Motion,40 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Van Puffelen filed by Frankie Shamburger, Reginald Southall. (Kendall, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
42 42 respm Response to Motion Wed 04/16 4:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:40 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Van Puffelen filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Cowan, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
utility Document Referred Wed 04/16 4:36 PM
REFERRAL OF42 Response to Motion to Judge Cassady. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
41 41 order Order on Motion to Quash Wed 04/02 8:50 AM
ENDORSED ORDER temporarily granting40 Motion to Quash. The subpoena at issue is not to be served or if served, compliance is not required pending further orders of the Court. Defendant shall respond to the motion to quash not later than April 16, 2025. Any reply to the response is to be filed not later than April 23, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/2/25. (Cassady, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
40 40 motion Quash Tue 04/01 4:14 PM
MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Van Puffelen filed by Frankie Shamburger, Reginald Southall. (Kendall, Edward)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Tue 04/01 4:24 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:40 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Van Puffelen . Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lamar Cowan, II on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Cowan, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
38 38 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 03/19 4:33 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part37 Motion for Protective Order. Protective Order entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/19/2025. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
37 37 motion Protective Order Wed 03/05 4:23 PM
MOTION for Protective Order filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Manning, Katherine)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Wed 03/05 4:53 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:37 MOTION for Protective Order. Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (fz)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
36 36 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 12/06 10:35 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J. Mark Hart and John Mark Hart terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/6/24. (Cassady, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
utility Motions Referred Thu 12/05 9:09 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:35 MOTION for J. Mark Hart to Withdraw as Attorney. Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
35 35 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 12/04 4:44 PM
MOTION for J. Mark Hart to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Hart, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
utility Document Referred Fri 11/08 12:32 PM
REFERRAL OF34 Amended Complaint to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
34 34 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/21 4:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed by Reginald Southall, Frankie Shamburger. (Kendall, Edward)
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Terminate Documents Mon 10/21 3:33 PM
Order GRANTING31 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Reginald Southall, as set out. Plaintiff shall file the First Amended Complaint on or before 11/4/2024. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 11/18/2024. Signed by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/21/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Response Mon 10/21 11:29 AM
RESPONSE to31 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ardon, Robert
utility Document Referred Mon 10/21 1:00 PM
REFERRAL OF32 Response to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
utility Motions Referred Thu 10/17 2:27 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:31 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . Referred to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
31 31 motion Leave to File Document Tue 10/15 2:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Reginald Southall. (Kendall, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EXHIBIT A
Thursday, September 12, 2024
30 30 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Thu 09/12 2:44 PM
Notice of Filing Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission filed by Reginald Southall. (Jackson, Sidney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
29 29 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Thu 08/22 4:47 PM
Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by Reginald Southall. (Harben, Christian)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Clerks Notice of Closing Thu 08/22 10:15 AM
Clerks Notice of Dismissal as to Defendants Solomon, Gulf Protection, Water, Waters Agency, and Johnson pursuant to City of Jacksonville v. Jacksonville Hospitality Holdings, L.P. , 82 F.4th 1031 (2023). Parties terminated. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/21 3:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants James Chad Solomon, Gulf Protection Group, Inc., Jonathan Waters, Jonathan Waters Agency, LLC, and Russell Johnson by Reginald Southall. (Kendall, Edward)
Related: [-]
utility Document Referred Wed 08/21 4:47 PM
REFERRAL OF27 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge DuBose. (meh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
26 26 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/08 4:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2025 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Trial to be held sometime in the month of December 2025. Jury Selection and Trial dates to be set at the Final Pretrial Conference. ETT 3-4 days. Discovery cutoff 5/9/2025. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/17/2024. Motions due by 5/30/2025. Position Regarding Settlement due by 5/9/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/8/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Pretrial Order
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/08 2:46 PM
Initial ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gulf Protection Group, Inc., Russell Johnson, Jonathan Waters Agency, LLC, James Chad Solomon, Jonathan Waters. (Smith, William)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 08/08 2:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2024. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 3A) (eec)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
23 23 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 08/05 9:38 AM
Order re: 22 Order, ( Scheduling Conference, currently set for 8/6/2024, is RESET for 8/8/2024 02:00 PM, by telephone, before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.). To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 571-353-2301 GUEST ID 002111804. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/5/2024. (eec)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
22 22 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 07/22 12:21 PM
Order re:13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Reginald Southall. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady BY TELEPHONE. To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 571-353-2301 GUEST ID 002111804. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 7/22/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
21 21 17 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 06/26 12:58 PM
ORDER denying9 Motion to Remand to State Court, as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/26/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian W. Harben on behalf of Reginald Southall (Harben, Christian)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sidney W. Jackson, III on behalf of Reginald Southall (Jackson, Sidney)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/29 11:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reginald Southall. Jonathan Waters served on 5/29/2024, answer due 6/20/2024 (Strickland, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
17 17 service Summons Issued Wed 05/22 3:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Jonathan Waters. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (meh)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons Wed 05/22 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Reginald Southall Notice of Proposed Alias Summons (Strickland, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
15 15 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/21 3:05 PM
Order re:9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Reginald Southall. Proposed R & R due by 6/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/21/2024. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 05/14 11:13 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Motion Hearing held on 5/14/2024 re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Reginald Southall. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 3A) (eec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
utility Document Referred Tue 04/30 9:23 AM
REFERRAL OF13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (meh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Mon 04/29 5:02 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Strickland, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/23 12:10 PM
Order re:9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Reginald Southall, ( Motion Hearing, by telephone, set for 5/14/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.). To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 571-353-2301 GUEST ID 002111804. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/23/2024. (eec)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/22 1:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Hart, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
utility Document Referred Mon 04/22 5:03 PM
REFERRAL OF11 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Cassady. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 04/16 3:40 PM
ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement9 Motion to Remand to State Court. A response to this motion, if deemed necessary, shall be filed not later than April 30, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/16/24. (Cassady, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
9 9 motion Remand to State Court Mon 04/15 3:16 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Reginald Southall. (Strickland, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 04/15 3:53 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:9 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (meh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
8 8 order Order - Document NOTED Wed 03/27 10:41 AM
Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Review of the corporate disclosure statement has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
7 7 order Order - Document NOTED Thu 03/21 5:50 PM
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Cassady, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
6 6 utility Case Transferred Mon 03/18 3:23 PM
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Preliminary Scheduling Order Mon 03/18 11:21 AM
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/18/2024. (eec)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/18 11:20 AM
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/15 6:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, The Allstate Corporation, Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.. (Manning, Katherine)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/15 6:01 PM
Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Manning, Katherine)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/15 5:29 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405, Receipt number AALSDC-3362962, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Manning, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit