Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: Lakeysha Greer Isaac
Case #: 3:24-cv-00155
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 4:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Dennis McDonough
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Dick-Federal Gov
U. S. Attorney'S Office - Gulfport
contact info
Defendant
Kai Mentzer
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Dick-Federal Gov
U. S. Attorney'S Office - Gulfport
contact info
Defendant
Ralph Brian Pauley
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Dick-Federal Gov
U. S. Attorney'S Office - Gulfport
contact info
Defendant
Scott Prescott
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Dick-Federal Gov
U. S. Attorney'S Office - Gulfport
contact info
Defendant
Martha Fore Purvis
Represented By
Lauren Elizabeth Dick-Federal Gov
U. S. Attorney'S Office - Gulfport
contact info
Defendant
Ashlee Lucas
Represented By
Wilson D. Minor-State Gov
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
MS Department of Public Safety
Represented By
Wilson D. Minor-State Gov
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office - Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Sean Tindell
Represented By
Wilson D. Minor-State Gov
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office - Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffery Alonzo Stallworth
6286 Hanging Moss Road
Jackson, MS 39206


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
minutes Status Conference Mon 04/21 5:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Status Conference held on 4/21/2025, Participants: Jeffery Alonzo Stallworth, pro se and Attorney Wilson D. Minor. Court conferred with parties regarding request to cancel upcoming settlement conference. Order forthcoming. (MJ)
Related: [-]
motion Settlement Mon 04/21 5:29 PM
ORE TENUS MOTION to cancel settlement conference by Ashlee Lucas, MS Department of Public Safety, and Sean Tindell. (MJ)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 04/21 5:35 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Ore Tenus Motion to Cancel Settlement Conference. After conferring with the parties via telephonic status conference, the Court grants Defendants motion to cancel the Settlement Conference set for 4/23/2025. Based on representations made by the parties, the Court finds that a settlement conference will not be fruitful at this juncture. The conference is hereby cancelled. The Court reserves the right to reset the conference at a later date, following the filing and briefing of dispositive motions. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 4/21/2025 (MJ)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 04/21 5:37 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The settlement conference set for April 23, 2025 is hereby cancelled. Based on representations made by the parties, the Court finds that a settlement conference will not be fruitful at this juncture. (See Minute Entry, 4-21-25). The Court reserves the right to reset the conference at a later date, following the filing and briefing of dispositive motions.***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (MJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/17 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/21/2025 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: 1-855-244-8681 Access Code: 23114382698. (MJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
26 26 5 pgs order Order Tue 03/04 7:49 PM
ORDER Governing Settlement Conference set for 4/23/2025 Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 3/4/25 (MJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
25 25 order Case Management Order Thu 10/31 2:30 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/20/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 5/6/2025; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2024; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2024; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 2/4/2025; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 3/6/2025; Motions due by 5/20/2025; Settlement Conference set for 4/23/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6D (Jackson) Isaac before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac; ADR Report due by 8/29/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 10/31/2024 (NL) Modified on 10/31/2024 (NL)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephonic Case Management Conference Thu 10/31 1:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/31/2024. Participants: Jeffery Alonzo Stallworth and Wilson D. Minor. The court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (NL)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 10/31 2:52 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves (NL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
24 24 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Wed 09/18 3:24 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2024 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 09/17 4:22 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss the federal defendants. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/17/24. (AC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 08/05 4:23 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Ashlee Lucas, MS Department of Public Safety, Sean Tindell.(Minor-State Gov, Wilson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 07/30 10:53 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 Response to Motion filed by Dennis McDonough, Kai Mentzer, Ralph Brian Pauley, Scott Prescott, Martha Fore Purvis (Dick-Federal Gov, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
21 21 service Certificate of Service Tue 07/30 12:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffery Alonzo Stallworth. (CO)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 07/30 12:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dennis McDonough, Kai Mentzer, Ralph Brian Pauley, Scott Prescott, and Martha Fore Purvis. The US Attorney for the Southern District of Mississippi served on 7/23/2024, answer due 9/23/2024. (CO)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order Staying Discovery Tue 07/23 2:39 PM
ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 7/23/24 (NL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
17 17 respm Response to Motion Tue 07/23 12:30 PM
RESPONSE to7 Federal Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeffery Alonzo Stallworth. (CO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
16 16 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 07/17 4:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Dennis McDonough, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (CO)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 07/17 4:46 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Dennis McDonough. (CO)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/15 4:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Ashlee Lucas served on 7/15/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (CO)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/15 4:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Sean Tindell served on 7/15/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (CO)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/15 3:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Martha Fore Purvis served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (CO)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/15 3:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Kai Mentzer served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (CO)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/15 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Ralph Brian Pauley served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (CO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/02 11:28 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Dismiss by Jeffery Alonzo Stallworth. (CO)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/02 1:05 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The new deadline is July 8. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 7/2/24. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (AC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
8 8 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 06/11 2:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dennis McDonough, Kai Mentzer, Ralph Brian Pauley, Scott Prescott, Martha Fore Purvis (Dick-Federal Gov, Lauren) Modified on 6/11/2024 to correct docket text (CO)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Tue 06/11 2:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Dennis McDonough, Kai Mentzer, Ralph Brian Pauley, Scott Prescott, Martha Fore Purvis(Dick-Federal Gov, Lauren) Modified on 6/11/2024 to edit docket text (CO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint of Discrimination
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
6 6 utility Remark Wed 03/27 10:52 AM
Pro Se Registration for Electronic Receipt of Court Filings (CO)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 03/18 5:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Ashlee Lucas, MS Department of Public Safety, Sean Tindell. (CO)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/18 5:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis McDonough, Kai Mentzer, Ralph Brian Pauley, Scott Prescott, Martha Fore Purvis, Ashlee Lucas, Sean Tindell, MS Department of Public Safety, filed by Jeffery Alonzo Stallworth.(CO)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Attachment Mon 03/18 4:56 PM
ATTACHMENT re1 Complaint, by Jeffery Alonzo Stallworth. (CO)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/15 4:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Dennis McDonough, Kai Mentzer, Ralph Brian Pauley, Scott Prescott, Martha Fore Purvis. (CO)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/15 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Dennis McDonough, Kai Mentzer, Ralph Brian Pauley, Scott Prescott, Martha Fore Purvis ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 7752), filed by Jeffery Alonzo Stallworth.(CO) (CO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/15/2024) Civil Cover Sheet