California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dena M Coggins
Referred: Sean C Riordan
Case #: 2:24-cv-00808
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2024
Case in other court:San Joaquin State Court, FL2014-5424
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 2:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Leah Chavez
6333 Pacific Ave #355
Stockton, CA 95207
Plaintiff
Rudolfo Chavez
P.O. Box 14441
Oakland, CA 94621

GPO May 23 2024
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/22/2024 DIRECTING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 14 days, why this action should not be remanded back to the San Joaquin County Superior Court due to a lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Murphy, J)
GPO Nov 05 2024
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 11/4/2024 RECOMMENDING that this Action be remanded, the 2 Request for Electronic Access be denied, and the Clerk of Court to close this file. Referred to Judge Dena Coggins. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations. (Kyono, V)

Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
15 15 motion Stay Wed 01/15 8:32 AM
MOTION For STAY Pending Appeal by Rudolfo Chavez. (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
14 14 respoth Objections to Findings and Recommendations Tue 11/26 11:15 AM
OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS13 by Plaintiff Rudolfo Chavez. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
13 13 motion Findings and Recommendations Tue 11/05 9:33 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 11/4/2024 RECOMMENDING that this Action be remanded, the2 Request for Electronic Access be denied, and the Clerk of Court to close this file. Referred to Judge Dena Coggins. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations. (Kyono, V)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 11/05 9:33 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:13 Findings and Recommendations served on Leah Chavez, Rudolfo Chavez. (Kyono, V)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
12 12 2 pgs misc Order Reassigning Newly Appointed District Judge Thu 10/10 11:22 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Troy L. Nunley: Due to the appointment of District Judge Dena M. Coggins to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from District Judge *Dale A. Drozd* to District Judge Dena M. Coggins for all further proceedings. All hearings currently set before the District Judge in this reassigned action are VACATED. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 10/10 12:07 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:12 Order Reassigning Newly Appointed District Judge, served on Leah Chavez, Rudolfo Chavez. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
11 11 1 pgs misc Order Reassigning Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge (SCR) Tue 08/06 10:57 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes to Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan for all further proceedings. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 08/06 10:57 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:11 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge Riordan, served on Leah Chavez, Rudolfo Chavez. (Mendez Licea, O)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
misc Mail Returned Tue 06/11 1:55 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not deliverable as addressed:9 Order to Show Cause sent to Rudolfo Chavez. Notice of Change of Address due by 8/19/2024. (Murphy, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
10 10 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 06/06 7:58 AM
RESPONSE to9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Leah Chavez.(Kyono, V)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Thursday, May 23, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 05/23 8:05 AM
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/22/2024 DIRECTING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing, within 14 days, why this action should not be remanded back to the San Joaquin County Superior Court due to a lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Murphy, J)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 05/23 8:05 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:9 Order to Show Cause, served on Leah Chavez, Rudolfo Chavez. (Murphy, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
8 8 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 03/19 1:20 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Leah Chavez re1 Notice of Removal,2 MOTION to use Electronic Filing,3 Notice. (Murphy, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
7 7 service Certificate / Proof of Service Mon 03/18 8:45 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Leah Chavez re:1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing,2 Request for Electronic Filing, Notice of Constitutional Question. (Murphy, J)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil New Case Documents for DAD Fri 03/15 4:12 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
5 5 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 03/15 4:00 PM
PROOF of SERVICE by Leah Chavez re1 Notice of Removal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 03/15 3:58 PM
PROOF OF MAILING to Rudolfo Chavez re1 Notice of Removal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/15 3:51 PM
NOTICE by Leah Chavez of Constitutional Question. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/15 3:48 PM
REQUEST to use Electronic Filing by Leah Chavez. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/15 3:44 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, Case number FL-2014-5424 filed by Leah Chavez.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Receipt Fri 03/15 3:45 PM
RECEIPT number 200006094 for $405.00 from Leah Chavez. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Fri 03/15 4:15 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Civil New Case Documents for DAD served on Leah Chavez, Rudolfo Chavez. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]