Rogers et al v. Board of Education of Santa Fe Public Schools
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Matthew L Garcia |
Referred: | Laura Fashing |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00262 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 3:20 AM MDT |
Defendant
Board of Education of Santa Fe Public Schools
|
|
Plaintiff
James Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosangela Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosangela Rogers. Board of Education of Santa Fe Public Schools served on 4/8/2024, answer due 4/29/2024. (Stewart, Gail) | |
NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
REFUSAL TO CONSENT to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (Stewart, Gail) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge Matthew L. Garcia as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
Summons Issued as to Board of Education of Santa Fe Public Schools. (bc) | ||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Maria Castille on behalf of Board of Education of Santa Fe Public Schools (Castille, Laura) | |
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for attorney fees under IDEA against Santa Fe Public Schools Bd. of Educ. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Rosangela Rogers, James Rogers.(Stewart, Gail) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9266851 re1 Complaint filed by Rosangela Rogers, James Rogers (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stewart, Gail) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (bc) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc) |