USA v. $144,638.00 In United States Currency
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Oki Mollway |
Referred: | Wes Reber Porter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00124 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 11:19 PM HST |
Defendant
$144,638.00 In United States Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings 2 - Set Hearings
Mon 04/22 3:10 PM
EO: The Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 5/13/2024 to 8/13/2024 at 9:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/19 3:29 PM
NOTICE by United States of America of Filing Declaration of Internet Publication; Declaration of Internet Publication; Attachment "1" United States of America.(Spector, Sydney) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment 1 | ||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 03/22 2:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/22/2024. Case reassigned to JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY and MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER for all further proceedings. SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR, MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new Civil case number CV 24-00124 SOM-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/19 7:12 AM
NOTICE by United States of America of Civil Forfeiture Action United States of America. (Spector, Sydney) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/18 11:16 AM
NOTICE by United States of America United States of America's Notice of Related Cases United States of America. (Spector, Sydney) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Fri 03/15 4:03 PM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (jni) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Fri 03/15 4:01 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/13/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/15/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 03/15 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00124 HG-WRP on all further pleadings . (jni) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/15 2:59 PM
CIVIL Cover Sheet by USA. (Spector, Sydney) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT for Forfeiture; Verification of Michael Lesko against $144,638.00 In United States Currency, filed by USA.(Spector, Sydney) |
|
Att: 1 Verification of Michael Lesko |