Rohan v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Mary S Scriven |
Referred: | Sean P Flynn |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00683 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 5:03 AM EDT |
Defendant
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Rohan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/09 12:55 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the Complaint on or before May 2, 2024. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/9/2024. (AC) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/08 5:16 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeannine Cline Jacobson on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Jeannine C. Jacobson. (Jacobson, Jeannine) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/08 4:25 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeannine C. Jacobson of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint
Mon 04/08 11:38 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of service
Fri 03/22 3:47 PM
PROOF of service by Nicholas Rohan (Demas, William) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons issued
Tue 03/19 9:15 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (JOS) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/18 9:19 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:24-cv-683-MSS-SPF. (AA) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/15 7:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Nicholas Rohan. (Demas, William) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 03/15 7:09 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Nicholas Rohan. Related case(s): No (Demas, William) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 03/15 7:07 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by William Chris Demas on behalf of Nicholas Rohan. Lead Counsel: William C. Demas. (Demas, William) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed summons
Fri 03/15 7:06 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nicholas Rohan. (Demas, William) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/15 7:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Nicholas Rohan (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21877598) filed by Nicholas Rohan.(Demas, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit LTD METLIFE Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |