Minnesota District Court
Case #: 0:24-cr-00070
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Ashley Anne Dyrdahl (1)
Represented By
Katherian D Roe
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Thomas Calhoun-Lopez
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kristian C.S. Weir
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Apr 11 2024
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Continuance of Motion Filing Date and Motion Hearing. Motions due by 6/18/2024. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/11/2024. (Written Opinion)(EPD)
GPO Jun 20 2024
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Continuance as to Ashley Anne Dyrdahl (1).Motions due by 8/2/2024. Responses due by 8/16/2024. Notice of Intent to Call Witness due by 8/16/2024. Response to Notice of Intent to Call Witness due by 8/21/2024.Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/20/2024. (Written Opinion) (EB)
GPO Sep 20 2024
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Pretrial Motion for Disclosure of 404 Evidence; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Compel Attorney for the Government to Disclose Evidence Favorable to the Defendant; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Discovery and Inspection; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Discovery of Expert Under Rule 16(a)(1)(G); granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Government Agents to Retain Rough Notes and Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/20/2024. (Written Opinion) (EPD)

Docket last updated: 03/16/2024 3:12 AM CDT
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
1 1 16 pgs INDICTMENT (Unsealed 3/14/2024) assigned to Judge Jerry W. Balckwell referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty by USA Kristian Weir, Thomas Calhoun-Lopez as to Ashley Anne Dyrdahl (1) counts 1, 2-6, 7-11. Forfeiture allegations as to this indictment. (ACH) Document QCd on 3/14/2024 (MMG). Modified text on 3/14/2024 (ALN). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/14/2024) (CLK). (CLK).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/14/2024) Initially Filed Black and White Version
2 2 Defendant Information Sheet as to Ashley Anne Dyrdahl. (ACH) Document QCd on 3/14/2024 (MMG).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Signature Page
3 3 Bench Warrant Issued as to Ashley Anne Dyrdahl by Judge David S. Doty. (ACH)
Related: [-]
4 4 Oral MOTION to Seal pursuant to LR 49.1 the Indictment be sealed and remain sealed until the defendants have had their first appearance by USA as to Ashley Anne Dyrdahl. (ACH) Modified text on 3/14/2024 (ACH).
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral ORDER granting 4 Motion to Seal pursuant to Rule 49.1(d) of the Local Rules for the District of Minnesota, the indictments proposed to be filed under seal be so filed and remain sealed until the defendant make his/her initial appearance before the court as to Ashley Anne Dyrdahl (1). Ordered by Judge David S. Doty on 3/13/2024. (ACH)
Related: [-]