Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00590
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez (1)
Represented By
Josh Herrera
Law Office Of Josh Herrera
contact info
Defendant
Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez (3)
Represented By
Tyrone Thelonious Mansfield
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mathew Jacob Engelbaum
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/16/2024 3:51 AM CDT
Friday, February 16, 2024
Arrest of Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez, Eddie Guillermo Jacobo, Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez, Eddie Guillermo Jacobo, Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez, Eddie Guillermo Jacobo, Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez. (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez. (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez. (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez held on 2/20/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (B. Espinosa) as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez (Court Reporter ERO.) (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez held on 2/20/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (B. Espinosa) as to Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez (Court Reporter ERO.) (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez, ( Detention Hearing set for 2/23/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,, Preliminary Hearing set for 2/23/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez, ( Detention Hearing set for 2/23/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,, Preliminary Hearing set for 2/23/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
14 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Mathew Jacob Engelbaum appearing for USA. . Attorney Mathew Jacob Engelbaum added to party USA(pty:pla) (Engelbaum, Mathew) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tyrone Thelonious Mansfield appearing for Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez . Attorney Tyrone Thelonious Mansfield added to party Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez(pty:dft) (Mansfield, Tyrone) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
16 16 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez (Mansfield, Tyrone) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
17 17 ORDER OF DETENTION: DETAINED WITHOUT BOND as to Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mv) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Preliminary Hearing as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez held on 2/23/2024 PROBABLE CAUSE FOUND (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required ( T. McEneny) as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez, Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez (Court Reporter ERO.) (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
19 19 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER OF DETENTION: DETAINED WITHOUT BOND as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (lg1) [3:24-mj-00726-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
23 23 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez (jg1)
Related: [-]
25 25 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez (jg1)
Related: [-]
26 26 REDACTED INDICTMENT/INFORMATION as to Sergio Ivan Hernandez-Lopez. (jg1)
Related: [-]
28 28 REDACTED INDICTMENT/INFORMATION as to Hector Joel Martinez-Gonzalez. (jg1)
Related: [-]